CARTER v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-01206-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PHILIP CARTER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Solo +1 949 727 3880 +1 949 753 1920 sololaw@sbcglobal.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexis B Babcock +1 202 616 7678 +1 202 616 4310 alexis.babcock@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/16/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment with Annuity
County None
Terminated 9/24/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [27] Judgment,,,,. Service: 9/26/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the form of an annuity, as provided for in the respondent's August 1, 2007 Proffer on Award of Compensation, together with the following lump sum payments: 1. A lump sum payment of $505,000.00, representing compensation for Year One life care expenses ($16,990.29), lost earnings ($265,227.13), and pain and suffering ($222,782.58) in the form of a check payable to Philip Carter, petitioner; 2. A lump sum payment of $151,835.59, representing reimbursement of California State's Medicaid lien, in the form of a check payable jointly to Philip Carter, Petitioner, and the State of California, SHCS/Personal Liability, Attn: Ms. Teresa Abbes; Further, petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the lump sum amount of 499,008.50, representing compensation for attorney's fees and costs, in the form of a check payable jointly to Philip Carter, Petitioner, and his attorney, David H. Solo, Esq. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
      JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by PHILIP CARTER, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [25] DECISION of Special Master. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007 DECISION of Special Master
        DECISION Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Remark
          Remark: A copy of the 8/31/07 Decision of the Special Master sent to Petitioner's Counsel via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery on 8/31/07. Tracking no. 8619-2827-7832 (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of APPEPTANCE OF DEFENDENT'S PROFFER, filed by PHILIP CARTER re [23] Life Care Plan. Service: 8/22/07.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Life Care Plan
              PROFFER on filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/1/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/22/2007 Status Conference Order
                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A follow up Status Conference to the 7/16/07 status conference is set for 8/20/2007 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Description not available
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/16/2007 12:30 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Status Conference Order
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/20/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/25/2006 Status Conference Order
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/15/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on December 15, 2006. (tlj, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Status Conference Order
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled for 10/17/06 has been reset for 12/15/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Joint Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/12/06.(tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006 Description not available
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file a status report, either jointly or individually, as to their progress by 10/13/06. Status Conference set for 10/17/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on August 15, 2006. (tlj, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Order
                                  ORDER Granting oral order to serve subpoena. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (mij, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Description not available
                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/15/2006 02:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 ERRATA
                                      ERRATA correcting the April 4, 2006 DAMAGES ORDER. Signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, ) Modified on 4/12/2006 (tjk, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Description not available
                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/13/2006 11:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on April 4, 2006. (tlj, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Respondent's Report
                                            Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/30/06. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Description not available
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondents Report Due by 3/31/2006. Status Conference set for 4/4/2006 12:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on February 15, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 notice of filing
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING Amended proof of service regarding documents submitted in support of petition by PHILIP CARTER. Service: 1/17/06.(tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 notice of filing
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING CD - [Medical records, pages 486 - 4,503] by PHILIP CARTER. Service: 2/02/06.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Description not available
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/15/2006 02:30 PM before Special Master Richard Abell.Due dated for Rspondent's Rule 4(c) Report is held in abeyance. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on January 31, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Description not available
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Rule 4(a) Status Conference set for 1/31/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Initial Order
                                                            INITIAL ORDER re Once respondent's counsel files a notice of appearance, the parties should contact the undersigned's law clerk to set the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 2/6/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis B Babcock for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/01/05.(tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Initial Order
                                                                INITIAL ORDER Once respondent's counsel files a notice of appearance, the parties should contact the undersigned's law clerk to set the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Petition
                                                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with Exhibits #1-9]( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063937) [Vaccination date: 11/20/02], filed by PHILIP CARTER.Respondents Report Due by 2/14/2006.(tjk, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?