SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01219-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SYSTEMS PLUS, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Anthony Madden
No Logo Netstar-1, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by COHEN MOHR, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Savarino +1 202 342 2550
Office COFC
Filed 11/21/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 2/22/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
ORDER denying [56] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
    REPLY to Response to Motion re [56] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [51] Sealed Order/Opinion, [52] Judgment, , filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Service: 4/3/2006.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 60 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Response to Motion
      **SEALED**RESPONSE to [56] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [51] Sealed Order/Opinion, [52] Judgment, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/3/2006. Service: 3/27/2006.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Response to Motion
        **SEALED**RESPONSE to [56] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [51] Sealed Order/Opinion, [52] Judgment, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Reply due by 4/3/2006. Service: 3/27/2006.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 58 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Redacted Document
          REDACTED DOCUMENTS, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. redacting [47] Statement of Facts, [49] Response to Cross Motion. Service: 3/15/2006.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: regarding [56] **SEALED** MOTION for Reconsideration. Response due by 3/27/2006. Reply due by 4/3/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006, Terminated: 4/6/2006 Terminated:
              **SEALED** MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [51] Sealed Order/Opinion and [52] Judgment, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Service: 3/6/2006. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 55 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                PUBLISHED OPINION (Originally Issued 2/22/2006 Under Seal). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, ) Modified on 3/3/2006 (mb2, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank 54 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Proposed Redacted Document
                  PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Redaction of [51] Sealed Order/Opinion, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 2/27/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 53 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Proposed Redacted Document
                    PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Redaction of [51] Sealed Order/Opinion, FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 2/27/2006.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 52 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of plaintiff insofar as the Contracting Officer's disqualification decision is concerned. The Contracting Officer's determination & Findings dated december 9, 2005, are vacated and set aside. As to the procurement, judgment is in favor of defendant and intervening defendant. The award of a BPA to NetStar shall not be disturbed. No costs. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
                        **SEALED**OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for plaintiff insofar as the Contracting Officer's disqualification decision is concerned. The judgment shall provide that the Contracting Officer's Determination & Findings dated December 9, 2005 are vacated and set aside. As to the procurement, the clerk shall enter judgment for defendant and intervening defendant. The award of a BPA to NetStar shall not be disturned. No costs. The parties shall review this decision and file proposed redactions on or before 2/27/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 50 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 11, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/26/2006. (vp1, )
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Response to Cross Motion
                              **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [40] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [34] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 1/19/2006. Service: 1/5/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Terminated:
                                **SEALED**Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/5/2006. Dispositive Motion Response due by 2/6/2006.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Statement of Facts
                                  **SEALED**COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Service: 1/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Terminated:
                                    **SEALED** Second MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record , filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Service: 1/5/2006. Response due by 1/23/2006. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 45 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Filing Redacted Documents, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Service: 1/3/2006 by hand.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Statement of Facts
                                        **SEALED**COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Statement of Facts
                                          **SEALED**COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/23/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Proposed Additional Facts
                                            **SEALED**PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS re: [41] Cross Motion [Dispositive], filed by NET STAR-1, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/23/2005 by hand.(mb2, ) Modified on 1/4/2006 (mb2, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Terminated:
                                              **SEALED**CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [40] Cross Motion [Dispositive] filed by USA, , filed by NET STAR-1, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/23/2005 by hand. Dispositive Motion Response due by 1/5/2006.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Terminated:
                                                **SEALED** CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [34] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/23/2005 by hand. Dispositive Motion Response due by 1/4/2006.(mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                  **SEALED** MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by USA. Service: 12/23/2005 by hand. Dispositive Motion Response due by 1/20/2006. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                    **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: [17] Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 12/23/2005 by hand. Response due by 1/6/2006. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Terminated:
                                                      Notice of filing First Amended Complaint and MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. Service by hand: 12/12/2005. Response due by 12/27/2005. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC., by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service by hand: 12/12/2005.(dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 12/12/2005. Response due by 12/27/2005. [FILED UNDER SEAL](dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 12/12/05. Dispositive Motion Response due by 12/23/2005. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (dw1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Proposed Redacted Document
                                                              **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Redaction of [30] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [17] Administrative Record FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 12/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Proposed Redacted Document
                                                                **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Redaction of [31] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 12/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Service: 12/16/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 1/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: [17] Administrative Record , filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Service: 12/16/2005. Response due by 1/3/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 29, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David Kasanow, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                          APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Dana B. Pashkoff, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                            APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kara M. Klaas, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                              APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Steven Sarfatti, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, ) Modified on 12/14/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Thomas C. Papson, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                  APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by James DelSordo, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Service: 12/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by William Savarino, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Service: 12/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by John J. O'Brien, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Service: 12/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Rowena E. Laxa, filed by NET STAR-1, INC. Service: 12/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Reply and Response to Cross-Motion due by 1/5/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA re [17] Administrative Record. Service: 12/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Administrative Record
                                                                                              **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (two volumes), filed by USA. Service: 12/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [5] Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [7] Motion to Seal Document, granting [10] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Anthony Madden for USA. Service: 11/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Record due 12/2/2005. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 12/12/2005. Cross Motions due by 12/23/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 1/4/2006. Oral Argument set for 1/11/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Redacted Document
                                                                                                          REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. redacting [1] Complaint. Service: 11/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/14/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/29/2005 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene , filed by NET STAR-1, INC.,. Service: 11/22/2005. Response due by 12/9/2005. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lg1, ).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow for all further proceedings. Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document [5] MOTION to Expedite, [1] Complaint , filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. Service: 11/21/2005. Response due by 12/8/2005. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order , filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. Service: 11/21/2005 by hand. Response due by 12/8/2005. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION to Expedite and to Shorten Time Limits by conducting an early status and scheduling conference; (2)requiring the United States to produce the administrative record by December 1, 2005; (3)granting Systems Plus leave to file a motion for judgment on the basis of an administrative record under RCFC 56.1 within 11 days of the date of production of the administrative record (4) requiring the United States to respond to the motion for judgment on an administrative record and file any cross-moiton within 11 days of the date of filing the Systems Plus motion; and (5)permitting Systems Plus to file a reply to that response and its response to any cross-motion within seven days of the government's response and/or coross-motion., filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. Service: 11/21/2005. Response due by 12/8/2005. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [05-1076], filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (LAB) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063941), filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC..Answer Due by 1/20/2006.(lg1, ).
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?