MCDONOUGH v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-01294-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MALOREE MCDONOUGH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by wlpmm-firm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. McNeill +1 870 932 0900 +1 870 932 2553 pmcneill@wpmfirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Traci R. Patton +1 202 353 1589 +1 202 616 4310 traci.patton@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 12/4/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [30] Judgment,. Service: 12/04/06.(tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
    JUDGMENT entere, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 119a), that petitioner is awarded compenstion in the amount of $10,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner. Further, petitioner is awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $8,664.34 in the form of a check payable to petitioner and petitioner's attorney, Paul McNeill. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 12/3/2006 Notice Not to Seek Review
      JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [28] DECISION of Special Master. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 DECISION of Special Master
        DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Stipulation
          STIPULATION, filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/29/2006 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 11/08/06, respondent shall file the executed stipulation. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT, filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH. Service: 10/20/06.(tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Status Report/Order
                STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 10/20/2006 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Status Report
                  STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/03/06.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH. Service: 8/22/2006.(mij, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                      ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (dls )
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Order
                        ORDER re By 10/20/06, respondent shall deliver a stipulation to petitioner for signature. Respondent shall file a Status Report when respondent sends the stipulation to petitioner. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Joint Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/25/06.(tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Status Report/Order
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2006 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 7/1/2006 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/27/06.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Status Report/Order
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER Respondent shall file a Status Report due by 6/23/2006 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/26/06.(tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Status Report/Order
                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER Respondent shall file a Status Report due by 5/26/2006 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : A Status Conference was held on 05/11/06. Mr. McNeill appeared via telephone for petitioner. Ms. Donohue appeared via telephone for respondent. (ds2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Description not available
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/11/2006 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (mij, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Medical Records
                                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit R- Medical records of Maloree McDonough] filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH. Service: 4/24/06.(tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Order
                                            ORDER: Enlarging time to file medical records. Notice of Compliance due by 4/14/2006.Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (mij, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Amended Petition
                                              THIRD AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition, filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH. Service: 3/23/06.(tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Description not available
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: The Special Master enlarges to 3/24/06 petitioner's time within time within which to file in appropriate binding and pagination: all previously filed exhibits, medical records, copy of VAERS report, all rehabilitation records, supplemental affidavit regarding petitioner's current condition. If petitioner cannot comply he shall file a Status Report. The Special Master will schedule further proceedings by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Order
                                                  ORDER re Petitioner shall file in appropriate binding and with appropriate pagination: all previously filed exhibits; all medical records; a copy of the Vaccine Adverse Events Reporting System report; all rehabilitation records; and a supplemental affidavit. If petitioner cannot comply with the time frame provided, then petitioner shall file a status report. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 notice of filing
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING [Amendment to Petition] by MALOREE MCDONOUGH. Service: 1/11/06.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Description not available
                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/24/2006 01:00 PM (EST) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Joint Status Report
                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/10/06.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Traci R. Patton for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Status Report/Order
                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2006. Respondent shall immediately enter a notice of appearance. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (lld, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, ) Modified on 12/19/2005 (tjk, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Petition
                                                                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064087) [Vaccination date: 12/16/03], filed by MALOREE MCDONOUGH.Respondents Report Due by 3/15/2006.(tjk, ) Modified on 12/19/2005 (tjk, ).
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?