BROOKINS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01311-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBIN BROOKINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by glassmanandbullock.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen C. Glassman +1 301 670 9200 sglassman@glassmanandbullock.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 1/30/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER and OPINION directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-83) held on June 19, 2006 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
        RESPONSE to [34] Supplemental Brief, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Glassman, Stephen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Administrative Record (Supplement)
          SUPPLEMENT to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. Service: 6/23/2006.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Moore, Lauren)
              LREF
              Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
              SUPPLEMENT to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (Moore, Lauren)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/19/2006. (vp1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant supplemental brief due by 6/23/2006. Plaintiff supplemental brief due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006
                    COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: REPLY, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS. (Glassman, Stephen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006
                      SUR-REPLY re [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S CROSS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS. (Glassman, Stephen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1); MOTION for Judgment upon the Administrative Record: Oral Argument set for 6/19/2006, 10:30 AM, in a Courtroom before Judge Marian Blank Horn.Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006
                          NOTICE, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS (Glassman, Stephen)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006
                            RESPONSE and reply to [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/16/2006. (Moore, Lauren)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                              COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [22] Statement of Facts, filed by USA. (Moore, Lauren)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                RESPONSE and reply to [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/15/2006. (Moore, Lauren)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-29) held on May 1, 2006 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [19] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [13] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), (Counter Statement of Fact), filed by ROBIN BROOKINS. (Glassman, Stephen)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                        RESPONSE to [13] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS.Reply due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Glassman, Stephen)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                          STIPULATION, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Moore, Lauren)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006, Terminated: 5/23/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS.Response due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) Exhibit 1)(Glassman, Stephen)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/1/2006. (vp1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Brief due by 5/19/2006. Defendant Brief due by 6/1/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006
                                                  Data Quality Correction re: [14] Statement of Facts. This filing as filed by defendant was deleted and re-entered using the correct event. (dls)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference reset for 5/1/2006, 01:00 PM, in Courtroom, before Judge Marian Blank Horn.Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Moore, Lauren)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 5/2/2006, 04:30 PM, in Courtroom before Judge Marian Blank Horn.Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Statement of Facts
                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [13] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. (dls )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006, Terminated: 1/30/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Response due by 5/19/2006 (per court order).(Moore, Lauren) Modified on 5/8/2006 to edit response due date. (dls ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: directing defendant to respond to the complaint by April 28, 2006; Status Conference set for 5/2/2006, 11:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc) Modified on 4/24/2006 to edit text. (dls ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION for Extension of Time until 5-15-06 to respond to the complaint, filed by USA. (Moore, Lauren)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                Reset Deadline: Answer Due by 4/28/2006. (dls )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                  RESPONSE to [9] MOTION for Extension of Time until 5-15-06 to respond to the complaint OPPOSITION, filed by ROBIN BROOKINS. Reply due by 5/1/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Glassman, Stephen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 4/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 5-15-06 to respond to the complaint, filed by USA. Response due by 4/17/2006.(Moore, Lauren)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                      Praecipe (i.e. Exhibits) filed by ROBIN BROOKINS re [1] Complaint, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/15/06.(dw1) Modified on 3/6/2006 to clarify docket text. (dls).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER directing plaintiff to obtain an ECF account by February 21, 2006; and directing plaintiff to file the omitted exhibits to the complaint in hard copy. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc) Modified on 2/13/2006 to edit text. (dls ).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 3/30/2006. Plaintiff shall file exhibits to its complaint by 2/16/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 2/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Response due by 2/27/2006. (Moore, Lauren)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Springer Moore for USA. (Moore, Lauren)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064090), filed by ROBIN BROOKINS.Answer Due by 2/13/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?