HEWINGS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-01292-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LATRICIA HEWINGS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Samster Konkel & Safran LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome A Konkel +1 414 224 0400 +1 414 224 0280 jkonkel@skslawyers.com
No Logo MILES LEE WILLIAMS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Samster Konkel & Safran LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome A Konkel +1 414 224 0400 +1 414 224 0280 jkonkel@skslawyers.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Ann Watts +1 202 616 4099 lisa.a.watts@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/14/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 9/22/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/25/2006 Description not available
SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file an application for fees and costs due 5/14/07 or they shall be deemed waived. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
    Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment. Service: 11/09/06.(tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $125,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner as special administrator of Miles' estate. This amount represents compensation for all damages that would be available under 42 U.S.C. Section 300aa-15(a). Further, petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $22,348.45 in the form of a check payable to petitioner and petitioner's attorney, jerome A. Konkel. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 DECISION of Special Master
        DECISION Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Stipulation
          STIPULATION, filed by LATRICIA HEWINGS, MILES LEE WILLIAMS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/24/06.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Order
              ORDER re The status conference scheduled for 5/23/06 at 11:00 am, EST is hereby cancelled. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 15-Week Stipulation Order
                15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 8/15/2006. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Description not available
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/23/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 4/25/06. (szs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Description not available
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/25/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Respondent's Report
                        Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/09/06. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Telephonic Status Conference held on January 23, 2006. A Rule 4 status conference call was held in this case. Present for petitioner was Mr. Jerome Konkel, Esq. Present for the respondent was Ms. Lisa Watts, Esq. (mm1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Description not available
                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondents Report Due by 3/9/2006. Status Conference set for 3/16/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. As per agreement of the parties, docket 05-193V and 05-1292V shall be consolidated for efficiency. All filings in both cases shall be filed as part of case No. 05-1292V. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Special Master Christian J. Moran for all further proceedings. Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz no longer assigned to case. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order
                                ORDER re Petitioner shall confer with respondent and then contact the court by 1/17/06, to suggest three possible dates and times for the initial status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Watts for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/06/05.(tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Petition
                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with one volume of records, Exhibits #1-13](Filing fee $250) , filed by LATRICIA HEWINGS, MILES LEE WILLIAMS. (Vaccination date: 2/14/03)Respondents Report Due by 3/14/2006.(tjk, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?