MILLICAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01330-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARC J. MILLICAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Michael Schwind +1 202 353 2345 +1 202 353 7661 gregg,schwind@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/19/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to District
County None
Terminated 8/24/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Court Filing
ORDER denying [23] Motion to Publish Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush.(teq)
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Motion to Publish
    MOTION to Publish Opinion and Order, Aug.24, 2006, filed by MARC J. MILLICAN.Response due by 10/2/2006.(Wickham, John)
      LREF
      Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
      Certified copies of the transfer order, docket sheet, and documents that comprise the record in this case forwarded to U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. (dls )
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER Striking [19] Notice of Additional Authority, as moot. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush.(teq)
          LREF
          Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Court Filing
          UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [15]MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by MARC J. MILLICAN, denying, as moot,[7]MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by USA,, and granting [9]MOTION to Transfer to U.S. District Court (D.D.C.) filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. The Clerk is directed to transfer plaintiff's amended complaint to the United States District Court of the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush.(teq)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
            **STRUCK** NOTICE of Additional Authority (Wickham, John) Modified on 8/25/2006 (mij, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
              REPLY to Response to Motion re [15] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix AFI 36-2603 (excerpt))(Wickham, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                RESPONSE to [15] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Reply due by 5/30/2006. (Schwind, Gregg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/6/2006, Entered: 5/6/2006
                  NOTICE, filed by MARC J. MILLICAN re [15] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, [14] Reply to Response to Motion Errata (Wickham, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006, Terminated: 8/24/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                    MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. Response due by 5/19/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Wickham, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Transfer to U.S. District Court (D.D.C.), filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (excerpt AFI 36-2504)(Wickham, John)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                        RESPONSE to [9] MOTION to Transfer to U.S. District Court (D.D.C.), filed by USA. Reply due by 5/1/2006. (Schwind, Gregg)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [10] Motion to Stay. Briefing deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed 3/13/2006 are SUSPENDED. Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer shall PROCEED pursuant to the deadlines shown on the court's docket, beginning with defendant's response due by 4/17/2006. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush.(teq)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006, Terminated: 4/3/2006 Motion to Stay
                            Amended MOTION to Stay further briefing on defendant's dispositive motions and brief (amended as unopposed), filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. Response due by 4/20/2006.(Wickham, John)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 4/3/2006 Motion to Stay
                              MOTION to Stay all further briefing pending a ruling on the motion to transfer, filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. Response due by 4/17/2006.(Wickham, John)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 8/24/2006 Motion to Transfer
                                MOTION to Transfer to U.S. District Court (D.D.C.), filed by MARC J. MILLICAN. Response due by 4/17/2006.(Wickham, John)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER. Should the parties wish to pursue alternative dispute resolution, they are directed to contact chambers at 202-357-6524. Otherwise, initiation of ADR proceedings is deferred. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006, Terminated: 8/24/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by USA. Response due by 4/13/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4# (5) Appendix Part 5# (6) Appendix Part 6# (7) Appendix Part 7# (8) Appendix Part 8)(Schwind, Gregg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006
                                    ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [6] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply Response due by 3/6/2006. (mij, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006, Terminated: 2/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply, filed by USA. Response due by 3/6/2006. (Schwind, Gregg)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg M. Schwind for USA. (Schwind, Gregg)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (AF) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064118), filed by MARC J. MILLICAN.Answer Due by 2/17/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?