BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01354-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BNSF Railway Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
Space George J. Marchese +1 212 808 7651 +1 212 808 7897 gmarchese@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/22/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 1/12/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys' fees and expenses. (lld, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by USA.. (Christensen, Jacob)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2006 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [17] Motion for Protective Order and entering protective order Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dc2, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion for Protective Order
              Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.Response due by 7/31/2006.(Kattas, Paul)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [15] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b) Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                  MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 9/1/2006. Status Conference set for 9/27/2006 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER setting date of May 4, 2006 for telephonic preliminary scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2006 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                            MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Appointment)(Marchese, George)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Kattas for BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Kattas, Paul)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Kattas, Paul)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006
                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Marchese, George)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006
                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 4/14/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006
                                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Marchese, George)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 1/4/2006 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064159), filed by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.Answer Due by 2/21/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?