SITEL CORPORATION v. USA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00021-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sitel Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/6/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/2/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, PROTO
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by USA.. (Christensen, Jacob)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
      STATUS REPORT ORDER--Having considered the [31] joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file by Monday, 7/2/07, a joint status report, if no joint stipulation for dismissal has yet been filed. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SITEL CORPORATION. (Kattas, Paul)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
            STATUS REPORT ORDER--Having considered the [29] joint status report, the parties shall file by Monday, 4/16/07, a joint status report regarding their settlement progress. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Court Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER--The parties shall file by Wednesday, 3/14/07, a joint status report indicating their progress toward settlement. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER--Having considered the [26] joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file by Monday, 1/8/07 a further joint status report regarding their progress in settlement. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Court Filing
                        STATUS REPORT ORDER--The parties shall file a joint status report by 11/21/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 11/13/2006. (Christensen, Jacob)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT (First), filed by SITEL CORPORATION.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Part 1)# (2) Exhibit A (Part 2)# (3) Exhibit B)(Kattas, Paul)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006
                              ORDER--Defendant's [13] motion to amend pleadings--Rule 15(b)--is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER--Plaintiff's [16] motion for leave to file amended complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by SITEL CORPORATION. (Kattas, Paul)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                                    RESPONSE to [16] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by USA.Reply due by 9/5/2006. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Court Filing
                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER--Protective Order filed 8/11/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006
                                          ORDER--Plaintiff's [17] unopposed motion for a protective order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006
                                            ORDER--Plaintiff's [15] unopposed motion for a protective order is hereby STRICKEN, as plaintiff's [17] motion fully supercedes the [15] motion. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006, Terminated: 8/11/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by SITEL CORPORATION.Response due by 8/28/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kattas, Paul)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006, Terminated: 9/13/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by SITEL CORPORATION.Response due by 8/21/2006. (Attachments: # (1) First Amended Complaint# (2) Exhibit A, Part 1 to First Amended Complaint# (3) Exhibit A, Part 2 to First Amended Complaint# (4) Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint)(Kattas, Paul)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006, Terminated: 7/2/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by SITEL CORPORATION.Response due by 8/11/2006.(Kattas, Paul)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 9/14/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                    MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                                        DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER--Having considered the [11] Joint Preliminary Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall complete discovery by Monday, 8/14/06, and file a joint status report by Friday, 8/18/2006, regarding further proceedings. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                            ORDER granting [10] motion to substitute attorney. Accordingly, George J. Marchese is no longer the attorney of record inthis matter. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                                              ORDER--Documents [8] and [9] are hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 4/24/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by SITEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Appointment)(Marchese, George)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Kattas for SITEL CORPORATION. (Kattas, Paul)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006, Terminated: 7/2/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by SITEL CORPORATION.(Kattas, Paul)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006
                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 4/28/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                Rule 7.1 Disclsoure Statement, filed by Sitel Corporation.(lg1, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064258), filed by SITEL CORPORATION.Answer Due by 3/7/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?