KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00037-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kimberly-Clark Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/13/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 1/4/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, PROTO
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION.. (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due on or before 1/5/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
        LREF
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Report, if pertinent, due on or before 12/1/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 10/23/2006. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006
                AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Kattas, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006
                  ORDER granting [22] Motion to Amend Complaint - Rule 15(a) Amended Complaint due by 8/29/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/22/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                    MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION.Response due by 8/21/2006. (Attachments: # (1) First Amended Complaint# (2) Exhibit A Part 1# (3) Exhibit A Part 2# (4) Exhibit B)(Kattas, Paul)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                      ORDER re [15] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 filed by USA Defendant is ORDERED to formally file its amended Answer by 8/9/2006. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Court Filing
                        PROTECTIVE ORDER (related to [18] Order on Motion for Protective Order) refiled to include pdf document. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [17] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006
                            PROTECTIVE ORDER (related to [18] Order on Motion for Protective Order). Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, ) Modified on 7/25/2006 to remove docket number (mb2, ).
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006
                              ORDER granting [15] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b) Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006, Terminated: 7/25/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION.Response due by 7/31/2006.(Kattas, Paul)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                  NOTICE, filed by USA RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER (Christensen, Jacob)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/25/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                    MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by USA.Response due by 7/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: In the parties' 6/23/06 joint status report, they indicated that Plaintiff intends to file a motion for a protective order to protect the confidentiality of documents that will be given to Defendant during settlement discussions. The parties requested two additional months to work toward settlement. In light thereof, Plaintiff shall file its motion for a protective order on or before 7/24/06. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 9/25/06, wherein they inform the court of the status of settlement negotiations. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (tjc)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                            Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/26/2006. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                              ORDER. On 5/25/06 Defendant filed a Status Report and Notice of Change of Position, wherein Defendant indicated that the case may be resolved without further litigation. In light thereof, the status conference set for 6/7/06 is hereby cancelled. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 6/26/06, wherein they inform the court on how they propose to proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich.(tjc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for 5/18/06 at 10 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to 6/7/06 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (tjc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006
                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (Kattas, Paul) Modified on 5/18/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/18/2006 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time. One business day before the conference, counsel shall call Ms. Shirley Scott, Judicial Assistant to Chief Judge Damich, at 202/357-6483, to provide the phone number where he or she can be reached and to inform the court whether any others will be participating for that party (and, if so, their names, phone numbers and affiliations). The conference will be on the record via audio-recording, unless either party requests that a reporter be present. Such a request must be made at least five business days in advance of the conference. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (an2)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006
                                                      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 4/21/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                        MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Appointment)(Marchese, George)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006
                                                          ORDER granting [10] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Paul L. Kattas for KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. Attorney George J. Marchese terminated. Signed by the Clerk. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                                                            ORDER Striking [8] Plaintiff's MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese and [9] Plaintiff's Notice of Appearance. The Motion to Substitute Attorney fails to comply with RCFC 83.1(c)(4) because no affidavit is attached. There is no provision in the rules for the filing of a Notice of Appearance by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (an2)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006
                                                              **STRUCK** NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Kattas for KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (Kattas, Paul) Modified on 4/19/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006, Terminated: 7/20/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                **STRUCK** MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION.(Kattas, Paul) Modified on 4/19/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006
                                                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 5/5/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric J. Damich. (lg1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064292), filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION.Answer Due by 3/14/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?