HOBART et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00038-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MABEL F. HOBART, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Morin & Herman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Miller, Sr. +1 503 646 0566 +1 503 644 9574 robert.miller@mmh-law.com
No Logo ROXIE HOBART, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Morin & Herman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Miller, Sr. +1 503 646 0566 +1 503 644 9574 robert.miller@mmh-law.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel John McGovern +1 202 616 4357 +1 202 616 4310 nate.mcgovern@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/12/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 6/26/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), That petitioner is awarded attorney fees and costs in the amount of $14,717.39, in addition to the June 26, 2006 judgment of compensation. A check for $14,717.39 shall be paid to petitioners and petitioners' counsel jointly. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
    Petitioner's Election to Accept [12] Judgment. Service: 7/14/06.(tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 7/2/2006 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
      DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Terminated:
          MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by ROXIE HOBART, MABEL F. HOBART. Service: 6/20/2006.Response due by 7/7/2006. (mij, )
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 DECISION of Special Master
            DECISION Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Respondent's Report
              Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/26/06. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Order
                ORDER re Respondent shall file the Rule 4(c) report post haste. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on April 19, 2006. (tlj, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Order
                    ORDER re Respondent's Rule 4 report is held in abeyance. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Description not available
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Rule 5 Status Conference set for 4/19/2006 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephone Conference held on March 8, 2006. (tlj, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel John McGovern for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/02/06.(tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Description not available
                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Rule 4(a) Status Conference is set for 3/8/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Initial Order
                              INITIAL ORDER: The parties should contact the undersigned's law clerk to set the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent James Matanoski for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/10/06.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Petition
                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064291) [Vaccination date: 12/30/04](Filed with one volume of records, Exhibits #1-10), filed by ROXIE HOBART, MABEL F. HOBART.Respondents Report Due by 4/12/2006.(tjk, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?