BAREFOOT et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00065-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVE DURIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molly Ann Elkin +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 mae@wmlaborlaw.com
No Logo EDITH BAREFOOT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molly Ann Elkin +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 mae@wmlaborlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/25/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 306 - Civilian Pay - Overtime Compensation
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/8/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Elkin, Molly)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Court Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 3/9/2007 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER Case remains STAYED until 12/1/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all plaintiffs. (Jaeger, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER - Case STAYED. Parties to file a joint status report by 10/25/2006 indicating progress made towards a final resolution Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/25/2006. (bre, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER Granting Stay for an additional 45 days Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (cvhj, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [12] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 8/8/2006 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion to Stay
                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Proceedings, filed by USA.Response due by 6/26/2006.(Jaeger, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until June 9, 2006.Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/9/2006. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006, Terminated: 5/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/9/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2006.(Jaeger, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer Due by 5/26/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006, Terminated: 4/28/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/26/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Response due by 5/12/2006.(Jaeger, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006
                                    Clerks notice granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Pursuant to RCFC 77.2(a).Answer due 4/26/06. Signed by Clerk of Court. (bre, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006, Terminated: 3/24/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/26/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.(Jaeger, Gregory) Modified on 3/24/2006 (bre, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064336), filed by EDITH BAREFOOT, DAVE DURIS.Answer Due by 3/27/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, ).
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?