KRASNEY et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00105-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CAROLYN HRUSOVSKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas E. Chimicles +1 610 642 8500 +1 610 649 3633 nec@chimicles.com
No Logo CATERING BY DESIGN, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas E. Chimicles +1 610 642 8500 +1 610 649 3633 nec@chimicles.com
No Logo MARION SACHUK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas E. Chimicles +1 610 642 8500 +1 610 649 3633 nec@chimicles.com
No Logo REGINALD A. KRASNEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas E. Chimicles +1 610 642 8500 +1 610 649 3633 nec@chimicles.com
No Logo STACY MARKOWITZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas E. Chimicles +1 610 642 8500 +1 610 649 3633 nec@chimicles.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/10/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 5/2/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, filed by all plaintiffs (Chimicles, Nicholas)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (mij, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA. Response due by 5/11/2006.(Stewart, G.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER rejecting [11] MOTION To Take Notice Of Certain Facts Regarding Excise Tax Refund Litigation And The Internal Revenue Service's Settlements Of Refund Claims filed by LEVINE, BLASZAK, BLOCK & BOOTHBY, LP, and directing the Clerk to return, UNFILED, the paper version of this motion. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dls )
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          MOTION To Take Notice Of Certain Facts Regarding Excise Tax Refund Litigation And The Internal Revenue Service?s Settlements Of Refund Claims, filed by LEVINE, BLASZAK, BLOCK & BOOTHBY, LP. Response due by 4/26/2006.(Rosen, Stephen) STRICKEN PER ORDER OF APRIL 7, 2006. Modified on 4/12/2006 (dls ).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/17/2006. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 17, 2006 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference originally scheduled for Tuesday, March 21, 2006 rescheduled to Friday, March 17, 2006 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006
                  MEMORANDUM, filed by all plaintiffs. (Chimicles, Nicholas)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/17/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006
                      NOTICE, filed by RADIOSHACK CORPORATION re [6] Scheduling Order of Letter re Status Conference (Clarke, George)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006
                        Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/21/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 3/21/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (rr1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                            MEMORANDUM, filed by all plaintiffs. (Chimicles, Nicholas)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                              NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250 and Receipt number 064418), filed by CATERING BY DESIGN, INC., REGINALD A. KRASNEY, MARION SACHUK, CAROLYN HRUSOVSKY, STACY MARKOWITZ. Answer Due by 4/11/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Exhibit # (10) Exhibit # (11) Exhibit # (12) Exhibit # (13) Exhibit # (14) Exhibit # (15) Exhibit # (16) Exhibit # (17) Exhibit)(dw1)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?