QUALXSERV, LLC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00138-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Qualxserv LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Ernest Borton +1 404 885 3275 +1 404 962 6859 thomas.borton@troutmansanders.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/22/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 2/8/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by QUALXSERV, LLC... (Borton, Thomas)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Court Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 11/15/2006 Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (nag, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006
                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF COUNT II OF COMPLAINT, filed by QUALXSERV, LLC.. (Borton, Thomas)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER waiving the requirement of initial disclosures. Amended complaint due 7/14/2006. Amended answer due no later than twenty-eight days thereafter. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ehl, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting leave to file [9] Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ehl, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006
                              AMENDED ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006, Terminated: 2/8/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 7/17/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006
                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 6/15/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by QUALXSERV, LLC.. (lg1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against USA (O) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064481), filed by QUALXSERV, LLC..Answer Due by 4/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?