HAIRSTON-REEVES et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00143-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSHUA HAIRSTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
No Logo TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel John McGovern +1 202 616 4357 +1 202 616 4310 nate.mcgovern@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/27/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 7/11/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $23,874.77, in addition to the July 11, 2007 judgment of compensation. Of this total amount, $23,676.77 shall be made payable jointly to petitioner and their attorney. The remaining $198.00 shall be made payable solely to petitioner. (lld)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
    NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [36] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. (Homer, Ronald)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007
      DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (co)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/24/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
        Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON.Response due by 9/21/2007. (Homer, Ronald)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007, Terminated: 9/24/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
          MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON.Response due by 9/4/2007. (Homer, Ronald)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
            Petitioner's Election to Accept [32] Judgment. (Homer, Ronald)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $250,000.00. (lld) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2007 (Reyes, Lisa).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [30] DECISION of Special Master. (Homer, Ronald)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                  DECISION Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007
                    NOTICE OF FILING by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 21;Letter Appointing Tangela Hairston Reeves Administrator of the Estate of Joshua Tyree Hairston)(Homer, Ronald)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                      ORDER Notice of Compliance due by 7/3/2007. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                        Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (McGovern, Nathaniel)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007
                          ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 6/8/2007.,Respondents Report due by 6/8/2007. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007, Terminated: 5/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 8, 2007 to To File An Expert Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 5/25/2007. (McGovern, Nathaniel)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007
                              MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #17 through 20] filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 17# (2) Exhibit 18# (3) Exhibit 19# (4) Exhibit 20)(Homer, Ronald)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 5/11/2007.Respondents Report due by 5/11/2007. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : A Status Conference was held on March 26, 2007. Mr. Ron Homer represented the petitioner and Mr. Nate McGovern represented the respondent. Petitioner will file literature that goes along with the expert report. Respondent needs 45 days to file Rule 4 and responsive expert report. CSM said once R4 is filed, parties should schedule a status conference to schedule a hearing date. (pt1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                    EXPERT REPORT of Dr. John Shane (Ex. no. 15 and 16) filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Homer, Ronald)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                      AFFIDAVIT by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Homer, Ronald)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                                        ORDER: Petitioner shall file her motion for a ruling on the record or alternatively her expert report by March 8, 2007. If petitioner is unable to file her motion for a ruling on the record or alternatively her expert report by March 8, 2007, then petitioner shall contact the court to set up a status conference call by March 8, 2007. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (jam, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                          FORMAL NOTICE Therefore, the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion(s) due by 1/5/2007. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                              STATUS REPORT, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 10/23/2006 Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : A Status Conference was held on September 21, 2006. Mr. Ron Homer represented the petitioner and Mr. Nate McGovern represented the respondent. (pt1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 9 by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Homer, Ronald)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 8 by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Homer, Ronald)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/10/2006. Petitioner shall file a status report indicating whether the vaccines given to petitioner's son contained thimerosal. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (mm1, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz:Status Conference held on July 11, 2006. A status conference call was held to discuss the filing of outstanding medical records and autopsy slides. Present for petitioner was Mr.Ronald Homer, Esq. Present for respondent was Mr. Nate McGovern, Esq. (mm1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Compact Disc Received
                                                                Compact Disc Received by the Clerk's Office re [10] Notice of Filing on Compact Disc. (tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #12 filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. Compact Disc is due by 4/18/2006. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                                                    ORDER Notice of Compliance due by 6/6/2006. Scheduling order; Rule 4(c) Report suspended. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : A Status Conference was held on April 7, 2006. Mr. Homer represented the petitioner and Mr. McGovern represented the respondent. (pt1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                        ORDER Granting petitioner's motion for subpoena. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006, Terminated: 7/11/2007 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                          MOTION to Issue Subpoena, filed by TANGELA HAIRSTON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. Response due by 4/17/2006. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006
                                                                            INITIAL ORDER Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (pt1, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel John McGovern for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (McGovern, Nathaniel)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                    Motion to desingate case as electronic and statement certifying counsel has a valid ECF account by TANGELA HARRISON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON. (Copy to DOJ) (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Petition
                                                                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064508) [Vaccination date: 8/27/04], filed by TANGELA HARRISON-REEVES, JOSHUA HAIRSTON.Respondents Report Due by 5/24/2006.(tjk, ) Modified on 3/6/2006 (tjk, ).
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?