CATERPILLAR INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00217-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Asv Inc /mn/

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 12/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, PROTO
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
ORDER Cancelling 03/07/07 telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (lg1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006
      STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by CATERPILLAR INC... (Kattas, Paul)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Court Filing
        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/7/2007 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Court Filing
          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006
            ORDER granting [18] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
              LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006, Terminated: 11/1/2006 Motion for Protective Order
              Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Response due by 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kattas, Paul)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [13] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b) Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [9] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b) Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Court Filing
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/13/2006 11:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/24/2006 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006, Terminated: 10/25/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                        MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Response due by 8/14/2006. (Attachments: # (1) First Amended Complaint# (2) Exhibit A, Part 1 to First Amended Complaint# (3) Exhibit A, Part 2 to First Amended Complaint# (4) Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint)(Kattas, Paul)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/25/2006 02:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                            NOTICE, filed by USA re: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER (Christensen, Jacob)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 10/25/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                              MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by USA. Response due by 7/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Christensen, Jacob)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [7] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Paul L. Kattas for CATERPILLAR INC. Attorney Jacob J. Miles terminated. Signed by Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lmc)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of Jacob J. Miles, filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Response due by 6/19/2006.(Kattas, Paul)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 7/7/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (lg1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064604), filed by CATERPILLAR INC..Answer Due by 5/16/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?