WELLS FARGO & COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00251-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "WELLS FARGO & COMPANY"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/30/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 11/9/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, PROTO
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY.. (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY. (Kattas, Paul)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Court Filing
        PROTECTIVE ORDER--Issued 10/12/06 by Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
          ORDER--Plaintiff's unopposed [10] motion for a protective order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006, Terminated: 10/12/2006 Motion for Protective Order
            MOTION for Protective Order, filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY.Response due by 10/27/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kattas, Paul)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Court Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER--The parties shall file a joint status report by Wednesday, 11/8/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                  ***Attorney Paul L. Kattas for WELLS FARGO & COMPANY added. (mij, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                    ORDER granting [7] motion to substitute attorney of record. Attorney Jacob J. Miles terminated. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006, Terminated: 6/29/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of Jacob J. Miles, filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY.Response due by 6/19/2006.(Kattas, Paul)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)JPSR due by 7/21/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY. (Miles, Jacob)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006
                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006
                                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 0664677), filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY.Answer Due by 5/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?