LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00277-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Locus Telecommunications, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Helein & Marashlian LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles H Helein chh@commlawgroup.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
No Logo KDI DISTRIBUTION, INC., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine, Blaszak, Block and Boothby, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Rosen +1 202 857 2550 srosen@lb3law.com
Office COFC
Filed 4/4/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-01184-RHH None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Court Filing
ORDER granting [4] Motion to Consolidate Cases 05-1184T and 06-277T Signed by Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (kb3)
    LREF
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
    REPLY to [29] and [30] RESPONSES to [25] Motion to Intervene, filed by KDI DISTRIBUTION, INC.. (Rosen, Stephen) Modified on 8/15/2008 to link to proper documents. (dls).
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (dls)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
          RESPONSE to [25] MOTION to Intervene, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Reply due by 8/18/2008. (Helein, Charles)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
            RESPONSE to [25] MOTION to Intervene by KDI Distribution, Inc., filed by USA.Reply due by 8/15/2008. (Stewart, G.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/1/2008 (jt1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Court Filing
                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Proceedings remain stayed though August 1, 2008, at which time a joint status report is due. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Stewart, G.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
                      MOTION to Intervene, filed by KDI Distribution, Inc..Response due by 8/4/2008.(Rosen, Stephen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Court Filing
                        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Order continuing stay of proceedings until July 21, 2008, at which time a joint status report is due.Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion to Continue
                          MOTION to Continue, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 5/8/2008.(Helein, Charles)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Court Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Case is stayed until April 21, 2008, on or at which time parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                              STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,. (Helein, Charles)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 8/4/2008 Motion to Continue
                                Joint MOTION to Continue and Joint Status Report, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 2/8/2008.(Helein, Charles)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [18] Motion For Continuation of Suspension of Proceedings; case is stayed until January 21, 2008, at which time a joint status report is due. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion to Continue
                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [16] Motion to Continue Suspension of Proceedings; Case is stayed until October 22, 2007, at which time a joint status report shall be filed. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion to Continue
                                        MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 8/10/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [14] Motion to Continue Suspension of Proceedings for an additional 90 days; case is stayed until 7/24/2007; joint status report shall be filed on or by 7/24/2007. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 4/25/2007 Motion to Continue
                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 5/10/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting Motion [11] to suspend proceedings for additional 90 days so tht settlement may be pursued. Case is stayed until 4/24/07 at which time joint status report is to be filed. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [11] Motion to suspend proceedings for additional 90 days so that settlement might be pursued. Case is stayed until 4/24/07 at which time a joint status report is to be filed. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)[STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                  ORDER: Document 12 was filed in error and is hereby stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007, Terminated: 1/26/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.(Helein, Charles)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [9] Motion to suspend proceedings for additional 90 days; parties shall file joint status report by January 24, 2007. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006, Terminated: 10/26/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                        First MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.(Helein, Charles)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [7] Motion for Suspension of Proceedings. Case is stayed until 10/24/06. Status Report due by 10/24/2006 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 7/27/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay all proceedings, filed by USA.Response due by 8/10/2006.(Stewart, G.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.JPSR due by 7/27/2006.(Stewart, G.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006, Terminated: 9/10/2008 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-1184 with this case 06-277, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,. Response due by 4/28/2006.(Helein, Charles)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064713), filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Answer Due by 6/5/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) exhibits 1# (3) exhibits 2)(lg1, )
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?