DIRECTV GROUP, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00311-VJW
District Judge Victor J. Wolski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

DirecTV Group, Inc. DirecTV Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/24/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 12/5/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by THE DIRECTV GROUP, INC... (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (bre, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/31/2007 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2006 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006, Terminated: 10/26/2006 Motion for Protective Order
            Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by THE DIRECTV GROUP, INC..Response due by 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kattas, Paul)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 8/21/2006. (Christensen, Jacob)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by THE DIRECTV GROUP, INC... (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Kattas, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                  STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by THE DIRECTV GROUP, INC.. (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064788), filed by THE DIRECTV GROUP, INC..Answer Due by 6/23/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 145 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?