PRIEST v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00346-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo SHIRLEY M. PRIEST, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James William Poirier +1 202 616 0856 +1 202 514 7969 james.poirier@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/2/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 9/4/2007
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 05-2524[U.S.D.C. Northern District of Ohio]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 41(b), dismissing the complaint for lack of prosecution. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. Service: 7/24/2007.(mij, )
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER allowing Plaintiff's notice to be filed Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE, (filed by leave of the judge) filed by SHIRLEY M. PRIEST (mij, )
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a response to the defendent's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to defendent's motion for summary judgment.Response due by 5/28/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Response
                RESPONSE to [19] Discovery Order , filed by USA. Service: 1/17/2006.(mij, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER Limited Discovery is Granted. Defendent shall produce documents.Notice of Compliance due by 1/19/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006
                    RESPONSE to Ms. Priest's Filing, Dated October 11th, 2006. , filed by USA. Service: 11/2/2006.(mij, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                      RESPONSE to [14] Order, , filed by SHIRLEY M. PRIEST. (mij, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER directing Clerk to file Plaintiff's Response Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                          NOTICE of Change of Phone Number by James William Poirier Service: 10/23/2006.(mij, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER Plaintiff shall file a memorandum with the court on or before October 13, 2006, indicating whether she needs discovery to address issues raised by the defendent's motion, and if so, the nature of such discovery. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Memorandum due by 9/27/2006 (mij, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 9/4/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 9/20/2006.Response due by 10/23/2006.(mij, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. Service: 9/20/2006.(mij, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 after the court decides on the motion for summary judgment to respond to Plaintiff's complaint , filed by USA. Service: 9/20/2006.Response due by 10/10/2006.(mij, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/20/2006. (mij, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/20/2006 to File Response to Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 9/6/2006.Response due by 9/25/2006.(mij, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extention of Time. Defendent shall their response by September 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mij, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                              ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by CLERK. (mij, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006, Terminated: 8/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/6/2006 to Answer to complaint [3] , filed by USA. Service: 8/2/2006.Response due by 8/21/2006.(mij, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/6/2006. (mij, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by James William Poirier for USA. Service: 6/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006
                                                        COMPLAINT against USA, filed by SHIRLEY M. PRIEST.Answer due by 8/7/2006.(lg1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lg1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                                            Case transferred in from District of Northern District of Ohio (Cleveland); Case Number 05-2524. Original file with documents numbered 1-5, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by SHIRLEY M. PRIEST.Transfer Complaint due by 5/30/2006.(lg1, )
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?