BAKA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00348-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH F. BAKA, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dawn Suzanne Conrad +1 202 616 2279 +1 202 305 7643 dawn.conrad@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/1/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $80000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/29/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
JUDGMENT entered, purusant to Rule 58, that plaintiff's claims that predate May 1, 2000 are dismissed with prejudice. Judgment on Plaintiff's claims that accrued after May 1, 2000 is in favor of Defendant. Plaintiff's claim that DFAD continued payments after Claire Baka's feath is dismissed as moot. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)or MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006, Terminated: 11/29/2006 Motion to Strike
      MOTION to Strike [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and [11] Reply to Response to Motion filed by JOSEPH F. BAKA. Service: 9/30/06. Response due by 10/19/2006.(dw1)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 9/14/06.(dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
          RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by JOSEPH F. BAKA. Reply due by 9/14/2006. Service: 8/25/06.(dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006
            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by USA. Service: 8/4/06.(dw1)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [7] Motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006, Terminated: 8/4/2006 Terminated:
                MOTION for Leave to File administrative record , filed by USA. Service: 7/31/06.Response due by 8/17/2006.(dls )
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA. Service: 7/31/06.Response due by 8/31/2006.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                    ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 7/31/2006. (signed by the Clerk)(dls )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/31/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint filed by USA. Service: 6/29/06.(dls )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Suzanne Conrad for USA. Service: 5/19/2006.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064841), filed by JOSEPH F. BAKA.Answer due by 6/30/2006.(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 156 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?