TICKETS.COM, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00361-VJW
District Judge Victor J. Wolski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tickets.com, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/4/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/27/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by TICKETS.COM, INC... (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (bre,)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Court Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2007 if matter is not settled or dismissed. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
        JOINT STATUS REPORT pursuant to the Court's order, dated February 9, 2007, filed by TICKETS.COM, INC.. (Kattas, Paul)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Court Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/2/2007. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007
            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report pursuant to the Court's Order, dated November 2, 2006, filed by TICKETS.COM, INC.. (Kattas, Paul)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/31/2007 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jp)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2006 10:30 AM before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski (jp)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))JPSR due by 8/21/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                            Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by TICKETS.COM, INC.. (lg1, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064854), filed by TICKETS.COM, INC..Answer due by 7/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 151 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?