LYONS et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00391-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDWARD G. LYONS, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Teresa Jean Womack +1 713 965 9244 +1 713 621 5227 reddingtaxcm@aol.com
No Logo MARILYN LYONS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Teresa Jean Womack +1 713 965 9244 +1 713 621 5227 reddingtaxcm@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bart Duncan Jeffress +1 202 307 6496 +1 202 514 9440 bart.d.jeffress@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/12/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $14000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 4/18/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by EDWARD G. LYONS, JR, MARILYN LYONS. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 068540. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
    MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by EDWARD G. LYONS, JR, MARILYN LYONS.Response due by 7/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Redding, Thomas)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that all claims by the plaintiffs are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006
      ORDER--The parties' [5] motion to stay is GRANTED. There shall be no further filings until the court so directs. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (smm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Lawrence J. Block for all further proceedings. Judge Victor J. Wolski no longer assigned to the case. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
          ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski (jp)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006, Terminated: 8/23/2006 Motion to Stay
            Joint MOTION to Stay case, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Jeffress, Bart)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
            NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Duncan Jeffress for USA. (Jeffress, Bart)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 064914), filed by EDWARD G. LYONS, JR, MARILYN LYONS.Answer due by 7/11/2006.(lg1, )
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 122 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?