FUCE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00395-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH FUCE, II, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/10/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $7000000
Nature of Suit 516 - Miscellaneous - Damages
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/17/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
106-cv-00304-CFL None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Remark
SEE LEAD CASE - 06-304 for the Notice of Appeal. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
    SEE CASE NO. 06-304C FOR JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. (dls )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
      SEE CASE NO. 06-304C FOR UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER DENYING [5] MOTION for Order of the Judgment; DENYING [9] MOTION for Summary Judgment; GRANTING [3] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to enter judgment dismissing the complaints for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls )
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 8/17/2006 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
        MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSEPH FUCE, II, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/16/06. Response due by 8/16/2006.(dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER: Consolidating this case with 06-304C. All future filings will be in 06-304C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer and Response to Motion for Judgment due by 7/28/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 7/12/2006 Terminated:
              MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/9/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 7/10/2006.Response due by 7/27/2006.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Terminated:
                MOTION for Order of the Judgment , filed by JOSEPH FUCE, II. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Response due by 7/24/2006.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 6/14/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by JOSEPH FUCE, II.Response due by 05/30/2006.(lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against USA (O) , filed by JOSEPH FUCE, II.Answer due by 7/10/2006.(lg1, )
                          LREF

                          Space Space

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 132 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?