SLUPKOWSKI v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00433-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STANLEY A. SLUPKOWSKI, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/1/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 528 - Miscellaneous - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/7/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Ruel 58, in favor of defendant. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
      RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by STANLEY A. SLUPKOWSKI.Reply due by 9/5/2006. Service: 8/18/2006.(hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Terminated:
        MOTION for Summary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by USA. Service: 8/11/2006.Response due by 9/11/2006.(hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer due by 8/14/2006. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 8/1/2006 Terminated:
            MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/14/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint filed by USA. Service: 7/28/2006.Response due by 8/17/2006.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 6/14/2006.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) , filed by STANLEY A. SLUPKOWSKI.Answer due by 7/31/2006.(lg1, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 42 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?