POPE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00446-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEROY D. POPE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Dean Moffatt +1 661 945 6121 +1 661 940 4916 jeffreymbajd@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anna Bondurant Eley +1 202 616 8254 bondurant.eley@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/6/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $400000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/1/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint with prejudice. (dls)
    LREF
    Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Court Filing
    Memorandum Opinion and Order of Dismissal granting [11] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [19] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007, Terminated: 6/13/2007 Motion for Leave to File
        MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by USA.Response due by 6/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2))(Eley, Anna)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
          REPLY to Response to Motion re [11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. (Eley, Anna)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
            RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss, filed by LEROY D. POPE. (Moffatt, Jeffrey)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's reply due May 22, 2007. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
                NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Bondurant Eley for USA. (Eley, Anna)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 3-15-07 to 5-22-07, filed by LEROY D. POPE.Response due by 4/2/2007.(Moffatt, Jeffrey)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's motion to dismiss due by 3/23/2007 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007, Terminated: 1/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                      First MOTION for Extension of Time until 1-12-07 to 3-22-07, filed by LEROY D. POPE.Response due by 1/29/2007.(Moffatt, Jeffrey)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006, Terminated: 7/31/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Affidavit # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix)(Thomas, Elizabeth)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time Response due by 12/20/2006 Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 10/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/20/06 to File Response To Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 11/13/2006.(Thomas, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 10/30/2006. (hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint; answer due October 30, 2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 10/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/30/06 to Respond To Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 10/16/2006.(Thomas, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer due by 9/29/2006. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/29/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 8/21/2006.(Kim, Nancy)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Aundrea Thomas for USA. (Thomas, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065002), filed by LEROY D. POPE.Answer due by 8/7/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 212 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?