SILVERI v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00478-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALBINA D. SILVERI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan, Robins & Daley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Golvash +1 412 281 0776 +1 412 281 2180 jgolvash@brd-law.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Lynn Brodrick +1 202 616 9197 +1 202 616 4310 robin.brodrick@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/22/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment with Annuity
County None
Terminated 8/20/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [34] Judgment on Attorney Fees,. Service: 10/5/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney fees and costs in the amount of $19,835.90, in addition to the August 20, 2007 judgment of compensation. This award consists of $16,835.00 in attorney's fees and $3,000.90 in costs. This total award shall be payable in the form of a check to petitioner and petitioner's counsel, Jeffrey A. Golvash. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
      NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [32] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. (Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 32 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
        DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
          STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO GENERAL ORDER No. 9, filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 9/19/07.(tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/05/07.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
              Petitioner's Election to Accept [28] Judgment,. Service: 8/20/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the form of an annuity, as provided for in the July 27, 2007 Stipulation, together with a lump sum of $115,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner. (lld)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
                  Joint NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [26] DECISION of Special Master. (Neal, Alonzo) Modified on 8/17/2007 (Neal, Alonzo).
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 DECISION of Special Master
                    DECISION Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007
                      Remark: Decision Fedex on 8/9/07, Tracking Number 861928277800. (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Stipulation
                        STIPULATION, filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/29/07.(tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 15-Week Stipulation Order
                            15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 8/9/2007. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Joint Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/26/07.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn owell : Status Conference held on 4/20/2007 to discuss the progress of settlement talks. A follow-up status conference shall be held on Thursday, April 26, 2007, at 2:00 p.m., local time, to apprise the court of the status of settlement talks. (jca)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell : Status Conference held on 4/9/07. Petitioner represented by Mr. Golvash; respondent represented by Ms. Broderick. Mr. Golvash has made a settlement demand that is being evaluated by Ms. Broderick's settlement broker. She anticipates making a counter-offer this week. Another status conference is scheduled for 4/20/07 to discuss progress towards settlement. (Vowell, Denise)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 notice of filing
                                    NOTICE OF FILING Volume XI - Exhibit #20- Dr. Lipitz's Narrative Report, Exhibit #21- Nerve Conduction Studies, Exhibit #22- Lab Results by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 3/22/07.(tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Status Conference Order
                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/9/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell, to update the court on the progress made in settlement talks. If the parties are still apart on damages, they should they should consider whether ADR will be helpful and have proposed ADR and trial dates ready for the status conference. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell: Status Conference held on 3/7/2007 to discuss the progress of settlement negotiations. A follow-up status conference was scheduled for April 9, 2007, at 10:00 a.m., local time. (jca)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 notice of filing
                                          NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibits #17-19] by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 2/21/07.(tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/11/2007 Description not available
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Ms. Silveri's Affidavit due by 3/9/2007. The supplemental narrative from Dr. Li, which had a previous deadline of 2/09/07, shall now be due by 2/21/07. A follow up status conference shall be held on 3/07/07 at 1:00 AM (EST), to discuss the progress of settlement talks. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/20/2007 Description not available
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file the medical records due by 2/09/07. Petitioner shall file the supplemental narrative due by 2/09/07. The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk to set a date for a status conference,; that date shall be prior to 2/03/07. An entitlement hearing shall be held on 3/07/07, in the event that this case is not settled. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell: Telephonic status conference held on 1/10/07 to discuss settlement negotiations. The parties requested more time to obtain additional medical records. (tpj)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                  Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell Status Conference held on 12/28/06. Discussed progress of settlement talks and set another status conference for 1/10/07. (jca)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Medical Literature
                                                    MEDICAL LITERATURE {Third Supplemental Table of Contents of Petitioner's Exhibits} filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 12/18/06.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/25/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/28/2006 10:00 AM before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/24/2006 Expert Report
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING: SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT of Gerald F. Winkler, M.D. (Ex. J) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/18/06.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Order
                                                          ORDER re [9] Status Report filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Petitioner shall file Dr. Li's supplemental narrative referenced in the status report due by 12/08/06. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 notice of filing
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibits #14-15] by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 10/26/06.(tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Medical Literature
                                                              MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit(s) C-I] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/17/06.(tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 10/04/06.(tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 notice of filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING Supplemental Table of Contents and Exhibits #12 Dr. Li's Supplemental Report and Medical Literature and Exhibit #13 Vaccination records by ALBINA D. SILVERI. Service: 9/25/06.(tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Status Report/Order
                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER Petitioner shall file a Status Report stating his decision on how he will proceed with this case due by 10/05/06. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell: Telephonic status conference held on 09/25/2006. Jeffrey Golvash represented petitioner and Robin Brodrick represented respondent. (tpj)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Respondent's Report
                                                                        Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/20/06. (tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Description not available
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER directing petitioner to file medical records, "recent literature" and an expert report by 9/11/2006; respondent to file its Rule 4 Report by 9/20/2006; and scheduling a Status Conference on 9/25/2006 at 10:00 am. Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (dls )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell: Telephonic status conference held on 07/26/06. Jeffrey Golvash represented petitioner and Robin Brodrick represented respondent. (tpj)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Lynn Brodrick for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/18/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Initial Order
                                                                                INITIAL ORDER Signed by Special Master Denise Kathryn Vowell. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Denise K. Vowell. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Petition
                                                                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065071) [Filed with Exhibits #1-11], filed by ALBINA D. SILVERI.Respondents Report due by 9/20/2006.(tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?