OHIO SAVINGS BANK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00490-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ohio Savings Bank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/30/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $111000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 2/16/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by OHIO SAVINGS BANK.. (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Court Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2007 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jo2)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Court Filing
        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Joint Preliminary Status Conference set for 11/16/2006 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006
          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006
            ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 10/20/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER re: Notice of ADR Pilot Procedures. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by OHIO SAVINGS BANK. (lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Court Filing
                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065093), filed by OHIO SAVINGS BANK.Answer due by 8/29/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 184 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?