PARKER HANNIFAN CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00494-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PARKER HANNIFAN CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/30/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $138000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County None
Terminated 1/11/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by PARKER HANNIFAN CORPORATION.. (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a) this day. (vro)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE. Joint Status Report due every 60 days, beginning 1/26/2007 Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER confirming PSC (phone) for 11/29/06 at 2pm. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Court Filing
          ORDER requesting 3 telephonic PSC dates during 11/7-30/06, nlt 10/31/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006
              ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.JPSR due by 10/20/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER, Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 7/24/2006 (vro, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by PARKER HANNIFAN CORPORATION. Service: 6/30/2006.(dw1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250 and Receipt number 065096) filed by PARKER HANNIFAN CORPORATION.Answer due by 8/29/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit)(dw1)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 119 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?