DAVIS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00507-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EUGENE DAVIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip Leon Davidson +1 615 386 7115 +1 615 331 9766 phillipldavidson@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Paul Schroeder +1 202 305 7788 +1 202 305 3291 richard.schroeder@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/12/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to District
County None
Terminated 6/14/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 2:06-cv-02087[U.S.D.C. Western District of Tennessee (Memphis)]
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Acknowledgment of Receipt
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Transferred Records received. The Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee received the record on December 14, 2008. (mb2)
    LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
    All original papers comprising the record together with certified copies of docket entries and order forwarded to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. (mb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [29] Motion to Transfer and directing the Clerks office is directed to TRANSFER this lawsuit to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Memphis Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1631. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
        LREF
        Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007, Terminated: 6/14/2007 Motion to Transfer
        MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Tennessee, filed by EUGENE DAVIS.Response due by 6/28/2007.(Davidson, Phillip)
          LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
          RESPONSE to [27] MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Tennessee, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/15/2007. (Schroeder, Richard)
            LREF
            Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/14/2007 Motion to Transfer
            MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Tennessee, filed by EUGENE DAVIS.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Davidson, Phillip)
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time. Absent the filing of a Motion to Transfer, the parties are directed to file a Status Report due by 6/1/2007 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 5/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/01/2007 to file joint status report, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Schroeder, Richard)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER staying [12] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); granting [23] Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 5/25/2007. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (teq)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007, Terminated: 5/11/2007 Motion to Stay
                    Unopposed MOTION to Stay sur-reply or, alternatively, for an enlargement of time, filed by USA.Response due by 5/25/2007.(Schroeder, Richard)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Sur-reply due by 5/8/2007 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (teq)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/08/2007 to file sur-reply, filed by USA.Response due by 5/18/2007.(Schroeder, Richard)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Sur-reply due by 5/1/2007 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (teq)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 4/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/01/07 to file supplemental brief, filed by USA.Response due by 5/10/2007.(Schroeder, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/22/2007, Entered: 4/22/2007
                              REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by EUGENE DAVIS. (Davidson, Phillip)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/22/2007, Entered: 4/22/2007
                                SUR-REPLY re [16] Scheduling Order, filed by EUGENE DAVIS. (Davidson, Phillip)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Surreplies due by 4/23/2007.Plaintiff and Defendant Sur-replies due on or before April 23, 2007. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jb2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                    NOTICE, filed by USA Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Schroeder, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007
                                      MEMORANDUM, filed by EUGENE DAVIS. (Davidson, Phillip)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007
                                        RESPONSE to [12] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by EUGENE DAVIS.Reply due by 2/20/2007. (Davidson, Phillip)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007, Terminated: 6/14/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Schroeder, Richard)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [8] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b), granting [10] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be considered filed as of 11/21/2006. Defendant's Answer due by 1/22/2007. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush.(teq)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/25/2006, Entered: 11/25/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Attached Out of Time, filed by EUGENE DAVIS.Response due by 12/12/2006.(Davidson, Phillip)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by EUGENE DAVIS.. (Davidson, Phillip)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                  MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by EUGENE DAVIS.Response due by 12/8/2006.(Davidson, Phillip)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER. ADR judge is available to discuss a means for resolving this action. Should the parties wish to pursue alternative dispute resolution, they are directed to contact chambers. Otherwise, initiation of ADR proceedings is deferred. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER re [1] Case Transferred/Amended Complaint filed by EUGENE DAVIS, due by 11/8/2006. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (teq, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Paul Schroeder for USA. (Schroeder, Richard)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric J. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. (lg1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                Case transferred in from District of Tennessee (Memphis); Case Number 2:06-cv-02087. Original file with documents numbered one volume, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by EUGENE DAVIS.Transfer Complaint due by 8/9/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) transfer order)(lg1, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 229 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?