E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00530-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc. E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Andrew Boyle +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 jboyle@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/19/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $934000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 12/13/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006
ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Hearing (telephonic status conference that was scheduled for Dec. 14, 2006). Case closed. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
    STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY.. (Boyle, Joseph)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Terminated Case - Public
      Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Court Filing
        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/14/2006 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006
            ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.JPSR due by 11/9/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
              NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Court Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY. Service: 7/19/2006 by court.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                      COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 65163), filed by E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY.Answer due by 9/18/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A part 1# (2) Exhibit 1 part 2# (3) Exhibit 1 part 3# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Cover Sheet)(mb2, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 161 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?