VUOLO
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00538-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GERARD MICHAEL VUOLO, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/25/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 528 - Miscellaneous - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/29/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5136'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [7] Notice of Appeal filed by GERARD MICHAEL VUOLO. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006, Terminated: 2/20/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 06-5136 for [7] Notice of Appeal filed by GERARD MICHAEL VUOLO. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by GERARD MICHAEL VUOLO. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee waived, motion to proceed in forma pauperis granted. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 8/29/2006.(hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this action. No costs. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006, Terminated: 8/29/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by GERARD MICHAEL VUOLO. Service: 7/25/2006.Response due by 8/11/2006.(hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Court Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006
                  COMPLAINT (in two parts together with a separate appendix) against USA (O) , filed by GERARD MICHAEL VUOLO. Demand not specified. Answer due by 9/25/2006. Fee not submitted, In Forma Pauperis status pending. (hw1, )
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 78 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?