LOCKWOOD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00543-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRYCE F. LOCKWOOD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William James Kenney +1 202 547 5129 +1 704 341 4781 kenneyffx@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Devin Andrew Wolak +1 202 616 0170 +1 202 514 8624 devin.wolak@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/27/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/6/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld)
    LREF
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION Granting [28] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendant dismissing the complaint with prejudice. No costs. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-42) held on July 17, 2007 before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
        RESPONSE to [28] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) statute of limitations MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) statute of limitations Kenney, William, filed by BRYCE F. LOCKWOOD.Reply due by 7/20/2007. (Kenney, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007
          REPLY to Response to Motion re [28] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) statute of limitations MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) statute of limitations, filed by USA. (Wolak, Devin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007
            STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [28] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and Joint Statement of Issue, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Joint Statement of Issue)(Wolak, Devin)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007, Terminated: 6/5/2008 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) statute of limitations, filed by USA.Response due by 10:00 am on 7/3/2007 (per court order).(Wolak, Devin) Modified on 6/26/2007 to correct response due date. (Samler, Debbie).
                LREF
                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Stipulation of Facts, Joint Statement of Issues of Law, and Defendant Motion to Dismiss due by 6/22/07, 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff Response Brief due by 7/3/07, 10:00 a.m. Defendant Reply Brief due by 7/6/07, 10:00 a.m. Oral Argument set for 7/12/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Stipulation of Facts, Joint Statement of Issues of Law, and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 5/23/2007. Plaintiff's response due by 6/18/2007. Defendant's reply due by 6/27/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007
                    NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [1:04-cv-1727], filed by BRYCE F. LOCKWOOD. (Kenney, William)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint stipulation of facts, joint statement of issues of law, and defendant brief on its motion to dismiss all due by 5/4/2007. Plaintiff response due by 5/30/2007. Defendant reply due by 6/6/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Stipulation of Facts due by 3/29/2007. Joint Statement of Issues of Law due by 3/29/2007. Defendant Brief on its Motion to Dismiss due by 4/20/2007. Plaintiff Response Brief due by 5/21/2007. Defendant Reply Brief due by 6/1/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                          NOTICE, filed by USA regarding Administrative Record (Wolak, Devin)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 3/2/2007. Joint Stipulation of Facts due by 3/15/2007. Joint Statement of Issues of Law due by 3/15/2007. Defendant's brief due by 4/6/2007. Plaintiff's brief due by 5/21/2007. Defendant's reply due by 6/1/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
                              NOTICE, filed by BRYCE F. LOCKWOOD (Kenney, William)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Court Filing
                                ORDER Plaintiff shall review the Administrative Record by by 2/15/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                  Reset Deadlines: Parties to file a joint stipulation of facts and a joint statement of issues of law by 3/15/07; defendant to file its dispositive motion by 4/6/07; plaintiff to file its response by 5/21/07; defendant's reply due by 6/1/2007. (dls )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff reviews the Administrative Record by 2/1/2007. Joint Stipulation of Facts and Joint Statement of Issues of Law due by 3/1/2007. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 3/15/2007. Plainiff's response due by 5/15/2007. Defendant's reply due by 6/1/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Administrative Record
                                      ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, contained on a CD-Rom, filed by USA. (dls )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                        NOTICE, filed by USA of filing of administrative record (Wolak, Devin)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006, Terminated: 6/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until January 3, 2007 to file administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 1/16/2007.(Wolak, Devin)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER finding as moot [12] Motion for Extension of Time, and granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 12/29/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 12/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 29, 2006 to file administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Wolak, Devin)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006, Terminated: 12/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/06 to to file administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 1/5/2007.(Wolak, Devin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 12/20/2006; plaintiff to file a brief notice re: completeness of record by 1/5/07. Joint Stipulation of Facts and joint statement of issues of law due by 2/2/2007. Defendant's opening brief due by 2/16/2007. Plaintiff's response brief due by 4/16/2006. Defendant's reply brief due by 4/27/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc) Modified on 12/14/2006 to edit text. (dls ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time: Motion to Dismiss, in response to the plaintiff's Complaint, due by 12/1/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006, Terminated: 11/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 1, 2006 to Respond to Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 12/8/2006.(Wolak, Devin)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [7] Motion for to Reschedule Status Conference. Status Conference reset for 12/6/2006 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn.Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion for Status Conference
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Status Conference to be rescheduled, filed by USA.Response due by 11/24/2006.(Wolak, Devin)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant's response to plaintiff's complaint due by 11/22/2006. Status conference set for 11/29/2006 2:30 PM EST in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (ah1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                              Set Deadlines: Answer due by 11/22/2006; Status Conference set for 11/29/2006 at 2:30 PM before Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 9/25/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2006 to answer/respond to complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 10/10/2006.(Wolak, Devin)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Devin Andrew Wolak for USA. (Wolak, Devin)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006
                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006
                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065185), filed by BRYCE F. LOCKWOOD.Answer due by 9/25/2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A; #(2) Exhibit B; #(3) Exhibit C; #(4) Exhibit D; #(5) Exhibit E; #(6) Civil Cover Sheet)(dls )
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 228 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?