MI HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00550-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mi Home Products, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/31/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $8000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 10/10/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 11/20/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
        NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Court Filing
          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065195), filed by MI HOME PRODUCTS, INC.Answer due by 9/29/2006.(mb2, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 158 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?