ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00548-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/1/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $96000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 5/2/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Court Filing
ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER granting Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006, Terminated: 9/27/2006 Motion to Stay
          Joint MOTION to Stay All proceedings, filed by USA.Response due by 10/12/2006.(Stewart, G.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                  NOTICE of Directly Related Case [05-516T] filed by ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC. (dls )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065196), filed by ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC.Answer due by 9/29/2006.(dls )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 166 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?