NATIONAL TRAVEL SERVICES, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00567-GWM
District Judge George W. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NATIONAL TRAVEL SERVICES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob J. Miles +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 jmiles@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/2/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 2/28/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by NATIONAL TRAVEL SERVICES, INC... (Miles, Jacob)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41a(1)(ii) this day. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
      ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 4/20/2007. Status Report due by 4/27/2007. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (sdb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007, Terminated: 2/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time,until April 20, 2007, to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 3/9/2007.(Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Court Filing
          DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 2/19/2007. Status Report due by 2/26/2007. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (sdb)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006
              ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 11/24/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                      Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by NATIONAL TRAVEL SERVICES, INC. Service: 8/2/2006.(hw1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                        COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065215) filed by NATIONAL TRAVEL SERVICES, INC.Answer due by 10/2/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(hw1, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 138 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?