NOEL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00568-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANIEL N. NOEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth C. Billhimer +1 202 371 7206 ebillhim@skadden.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claudia Burke +1 202 353 9063 +1 202 307 0972 claudia.burke@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/2/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $50000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 2/6/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by USA.. (Burke, Claudia)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Burke, Claudia)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
        ORDER re [28] Joint Status Report: The parties' request for a continuation of the stay is granted. Joint status report due on or before 1/25/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sg)
          LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Burke, Claudia)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
            ORDER: The parties' request for a continuation of the stay is granted. A joint status report shall be filed on or before 12/4/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sg)
              LREF
              Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Burke, Claudia)
                LREF
                Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Court Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 10/5/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Burke, Claudia)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Court Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 7/25/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Burke, Claudia)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [21] Joint Motion to Stay the proceedings to remand the case to the ABCMR. The case is hereby STAYED indefinitely. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report every 90 days and within 30 days after a decision is rendered by the ABCMR. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007, Terminated: 1/25/2007 Motion to Stay
                          Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings to remand the case to the ABCMR, filed by USA.Response due by 2/8/2007.(Burke, Claudia)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                            MEMORANDUM re: [13] Cross Motion [Dispositive], filed by DANIEL N. NOEL. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Tab C Part 1# (2) Appendix Tab C Part 2# (3) Appendix Tab D Part 1# (4) Appendix Tab D Part 2# (5) Appendix Tab D Part 3# (6) Appendix Tab D Part 4# (7) Appendix Tab D Part 5)(Billhimer, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [17] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply to [16] Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Defendant's Response shall be filed on or before 1/22/2007. Defendant's Response to [13] Plaintiff's Cross Motion and Response to [8] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is STAYED pending resolution of [16] Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
                              ORDER denying [15] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Paper Copies of Plaintiff's Appendix. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007, Terminated: 1/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/22/2007 to File Response or Reply to plaintiff's motion to supplement the record, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2007.(Burke, Claudia)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                  MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [12] Administrative Record, filed by DANIEL N. NOEL.Response due by 1/8/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Billhimer, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 1/8/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                  MOTION for Leave to File PAPER COPIES OF PLAINTIFF'S APPENDIX, filed by DANIEL N. NOEL.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Billhimer, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                    COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: Based Upon the Administrative Record, filed by DANIEL N. NOEL. (Billhimer, Elizabeth)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2008 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                      CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [8] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA,, filed by DANIEL N. NOEL.Response due by 1/22/2007.(Billhimer, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Administrative Record
                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (IV Volumes), filed by USA. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Appendix
                                          APPENDIX to [8] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                                            ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time, Leave to File Paper Copies of the Administrative Record and Appendix. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attached administrative record and appendix Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 12/18/2006.(Burke, Claudia)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                ORDER re Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Paper Copies of the Administrative Record and Appendix. Motion for Leave due on or before 12/1/2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (bmf)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the alternative, motion for judgment upon the agency record, filed by USA.Response due by 12/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Cover and tables# (2) Statement of Facts)(Burke, Claudia)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                    Re-Set Deadlines: Answer due by 11/21/2006. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                      ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by the Clerk. Answer due by 10/2/2006. (mb2, ) Modified on 9/29/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until Nov. 21, 2006 to Respond to the complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 10/16/2006.(Burke, Claudia)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (sms)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Burke for USA. (Burke, Claudia)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Notice of Appearance received August 17, 2006. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (pr1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065218), filed by DANIEL N. NOEL.Answer due by 10/2/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Sheet)(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 235 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?