MISYS PHYSICIAN SYSTEMS,LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00604-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Misys Physician Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/29/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 11/22/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by MISYS PHYSICIAN SYSTEMS,LLC.. (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (bre, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Court Filing
      ADR Conference ORDER: Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
        NOTICE, filed by MISYS PHYSICIAN SYSTEMS,LLC re [8] ADR Scheduling Order ADR Confidentiality Agreement (Kattas, Paul)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
          ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 12/18/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Court Filing
            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER:ADR Conference set for 11/3/2006, 3:00PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. ADR Confidentiality Agreement due via fax by 12:00 p.m., 10/30/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (vh1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
              NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Court Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn for ADR Pilot proceedings. (bre, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006
                    COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065343), filed by MISYS PHYSICIAN SYSTEMS,LLC.Answer due by 10/30/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(bre, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (bre, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy Firestone. (bre, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by MISYS PHYSICIAN SYSTEMS,LLC. Service: 8/28/2006.(bre, )
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 168 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?