BOLANOS v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00621-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BELISARIO BOLANOS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sterns & Walker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristy Marie Arevalo +1 909 335 0444 +1 909 335 0452 kma@wmtrial-law.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Wernett McInerny +1 202 353 3919 julia.mcinerny@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/6/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 6/8/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant tp Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $20,080.94. A check in this amount shall be paid to petitioner and petitioner's counsel jointly. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/30/2008 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
    DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Remark
      Remark. A copy of the 3/28/08 Decision was sent via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery to Petitioner's Counsel on 3/28/08 by the Office of the Clerk. Tracking no. 8651 8314 8094 (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/8/2008 Terminated:
        AMENDED MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 12/4/07. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/9/2007 Terminated:
          MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 12/04/07.Response due by 12/21/2007. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file a request for attorney fees and costs with the court or it will be deemed waived. Motion(s) due by 12/5/2007. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order Concluding Proceedings
              Order Concluding Proceedings Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Terminated:
                MOTION to Withdraw, filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 5/15/07.Response due by 6/1/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Terminated:
                  Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kristy Arevalo in place of Douglas Welebir, filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 5/09/07. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                    ***Attorney Kristy Marie Arevalo for BELISARIO BOLANOS added. Attorney Douglas Ferd Welebir terminated. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                      ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/5/2007 Order
                        ORDER re All imminent aspects of this case seem to be ripe for the upcoming hearing scheduled for 7/17/07. If any issues arise the parties are instructed to contact the court as soon as possible. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Medical Literature
                          MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #11-16] filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 5/1/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Hearing Order
                            ENTITLEMENT PREHEARING ORDER: An Evidentiary Hearing is set for 7/17/2007 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Prehearing Submissions due by 6/26/07. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prehearing Submissions due by 6/26/2007. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Order
                                ORDER re The parties shall provide the Court with their choice of a hearing date as soon as possible. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Affidavit
                                  AFFIDAVIT by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 3/30/07.(tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT [Exhibits #7-10] by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 3/30/07.(tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/8/2007 notice of filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit #6- Loma Linda University Health Care, Certificate of no records] by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 3/30/07.(tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/18/2007 notice of filing
                                        NOTICE OF FILING Supplemental Exhibits C [Tabs 1, 3, 4, 8, 13, 15, 16 and 17] by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/14/07.(tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/24/2007 Status Conference Order
                                          ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/12/2007 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell: A Status Conference was held on 15 February 2007, in which Respondent stated its need for additional records. Petitioner agreed to pursue such records, to file them if they exist, and/or to file an affidavit of non-existence for all records that prove to be unavailable. Petitioner also agreed to resolve an issue regarding Petitioner's legal name and aliases. Regarding a hearing, the parties did not foresee a factual dispute, and so presumably, a hearing could be conducted telephonically. The next status conference is set for 12 April 2007 at 11:30 AM (EDT).(irk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Respondent's Report
                                              Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/12/07. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Medical Records
                                                MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #5] filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 2/09/07.(tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Description not available
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent avers that its Rule 4(c) report will be filed on time, 2/12/07, but will also include a medical expert report and the documentation attendant thereto. Status Conference set for 2/15/2007 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007
                                                    A Status Conference was held on 10 January 2007 before Special Master Richard Abell. Having received certain filings required of Petitioner, the Court counseled Petitioner to revise or refile exhibits as may be necessary, in order that Respondent meet its 4(c) filing schedule previously ordered by the Court.(dlm, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Medical Records
                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibits #1-4] filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Service: 1/05/07.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/10/2006 notice of filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING [CV of Dr. Marks] by BELISARIO BOLANOS. Filed by leave of the Special Master. Service: 11/09/06.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/10/2007 12:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                            ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/9/2007 12:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Respondent's 4(c) report is hereby held in abeyance through 2/12/07. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Respondents Report due by 2/12/2007. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Richard Abell : Telephonic Status Conference held on November 2, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The initial Rule 4(a) Status Conference is set for 11/2/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006
                                                                    INITIAL ORDER Once Respondent enters a Notice of Appearance, the parties shall contact the Court to schedule the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Initial Order
                                                                      INITIAL ORDER Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Wernett McInerny for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/14/06.(tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Petition
                                                                            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065380) [Vaccination date: 11/24/03][Filed with one volume, Exhibits #1-23], filed by BELISARIO BOLANOS.Respondents Report due by 12/5/2006.(tjk, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 107 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?