FOREST CITY SERVICES, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00627-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FOREST CITY SERVICES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/7/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 11/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
NOTICE, filed by FOREST CITY SERVICES, INC. Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Kattas, Paul)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (mij, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [7] Defendent's Motion for Extension of Time to December 6, within which to file Answer. Plaintiff does not oppose. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006, Terminated: 11/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
        First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/6/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 11/20/2006.(Christensen, Jacob)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
          NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
            NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mij, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2006 (mij, ).
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mij, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by FOREST CITY SERVICES, INC.. Service: 9/7/2006.(mij, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $250) , filed by FOREST CITY SERVICES, INC..Answer due by 11/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(mij, ).
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 118 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?