LAZENBERRY et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00631-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HENRY LAZENBERRY, Petitioner
No Logo JIMMIE LEE LAZENBERRY, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathaniel John McGovern +1 202 616 4357 +1 202 616 4310 nate.mcgovern@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/21/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 7/27/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Order Dismissing Case
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
      ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Terminated:
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by JIMMIE LEE LAZENBERRY, BETTY LAZENBERRY, HENRY LAZENBERRY, RICKY LAZENBERRY. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Order
          ORDER re Petitioner shall file documents with the Court pursuant to the Rules and Vaccine Guidelines. The Clerk's Office is ORDERED to file the documents from Petitioner on 4/26/07, by Leave of the Special Master. [Birth Certificates and Letter from Petitioner attached to Order]. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Order
            ORDER re The 3/26/07 document from Mr. Lazenberry is attached to this order and hereby filed by leave of the undersigned. A copy of this order was served upon respondent. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Order
              ORDER The 2/22/07 letter from Petitioner is hereby filed by leave of the special master and attached to this order. In the letter Mr. Lazenberry requested additional time to file materials in response to the 2/25/07 Order. Petitioner's request is GRANTED. Mr. Lazenberry shall file the materials by 4/02/07. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/28/2007 Order
                ORDER re It is ORDERED that Mr. Lazenberry submit any information to clarify his claims due by 2/22/07. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/20/06.Response due by 12/7/2006. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Respondent's Report
                    Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/20/06. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/29/2006 Description not available
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The letter submitted to the court by Petitioner dated 10/16/06 is filed by leave of the Special Master and attached to this paper order. Respondents Report due by 11/20/2006. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Letter
                        Letter from Petitioner (Filed by leave of the Special Master). (Copy to DOJ) (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Order
                          ORDER re Petitioner shall submit a certificate of service stating that he had provided Respondent a copy of any documents submitted after the initial petition. Petitioner shall submit documents in accorandance with Vaccine Rule 17(d). The initial status conference should be deferred until after Respondent files its report. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Initial Order
                            INITIAL ORDER The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 9/29/06, to schedule the initial status conference call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel John McGovern for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/19/06.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Petition
                                  PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee NOT PAID $250) , filed by HENRY LAZENBERRY, JIMMIE LEE LAZENBERRY.Respondents Report due by 11/20/2006.(tjk, )
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?