CONNER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00655-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo THOMAS PAUL CONNER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Robert Malo +1 202 305 7539 +1 202 514 9440 jeffrey.r.malo@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/14/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 3/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1)Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER granting [6] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 SurreplyCourt Filing
      SUR-REPLY re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by THOMAS PAUL CONNER, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/12/07.(dw1)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/26/07.(dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Response to MotionCourt Filing
          RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by THOMAS PAUL CONNER, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/13/07.(dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Response due by 4/13/2007. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Response to MotionCourt Filing
              RESPONSE to [7] MOTION for Extension of Time until April 13, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, by leave of the Judge.Reply due by 2/12/2007. Service: 1/30/07.(dw1)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Terminated: Court Filing
                MOTION for Extension of Time until April 13, 2007 to File Response to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by THOMAS PAUL CONNER, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/23/07. Response due by 2/9/2007.(dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 12/13/06. Response due by 1/16/2007.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 12/13/2006. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/13/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/30/06.(dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrrey Robert Malo for USA. Service: 11/13/06.(dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                          Reset Deadline: Answer due by 11/27/2006. (dls )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                            Complaint was inadvertently served on the wrong division at the Department of Justice. It has been re-served on the Tax Division with the answer due date adjusted accordingly. (dls)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250 and Receipt number 065426) filed by THOMAS PAUL CONNER. Answer due by 11/13/2006.(dw1)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?