ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00682-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Alion Science And Technology Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Scott Hommer, III +1 703 760 1600 jshommer@venable.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo ITT Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
Office COFC
Filed 9/29/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 10/10/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Court Filing
PUBLISHED OPINION (Reissuance of October 11, 2006, opinion for publication). Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, ) Modified on 10/31/2006 to clarify text. (dls ).
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
    **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing Proposed Redactions of the Court's October 11th, 2006 Opinion and Order, filed by ITT CORPORATION Service: 10/18/2006.(mij, )
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
      **SEALED** TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-73) held on October 6, 2006 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (dw1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
        REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ITT CORPORATION Opposition to TRO Application. (Papson, Thomas)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Court Filing
          **SEALED** OPINION Memorializing Ruling at October 6, 2006, Hearing re: [18] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION,, [7] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, . Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, ) Modified on 10/31/2006 to eidt text. (dls).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/6/2006. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
              NOTICE, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to RCFC 41(a) (Hommer, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Agreed-Upon Redacted Copy of Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Hommer, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                  REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Agreed-Upon Redacted Copy of Complaint. (Hommer, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kara M. Klaas, filed by ITT CORPORATION. (Papson, Thomas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jason N. Workmaster, filed by ITT CORPORATION. (Papson, Thomas)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Thomas C. Papson, filed by ITT CORPORATION. (Papson, Thomas)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [6] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                            **SEALED**MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re: [18] Motion for TRO, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/5/2006.(mij, )
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 10/11/2006 Motion for TRO
                              **SEALED** MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/5/2006.Response due by 10/23/2006. (mij, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                ITT Opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Service: 10/6/2006.(mij, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Oral Argument set for 10/6/2006 01:00 PM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:.Responses due by 10/13/2006. Reply due by 10/18/2006. Administrative Record due by 10/10/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Court Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [8] Motion to Intervene, granting [12] Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record on CD-ROM and to Waive Paper Copy, filed by USA.Response due by 10/20/2006.(Hughes, Frank)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Court Filing
                                            NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to the case. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jefferson Hughes for USA. (Hughes, Frank)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006
                                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ITT CORPORATION. (Papson, Thomas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                  MOTION to Intervene, filed by ITT CORPORATION.Response due by 10/19/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex 1 GAO Decision# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Papson, Thomas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006
                                                  ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. Judge Hodges has expressed a willingness to take this case. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Terminated:
                                                    **SEALED** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Redacted Version of the Memorandum of Law #(2) Memorandum of Law)(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006, Terminated: 10/6/2006 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Complaint, Motion for Injunctive Relief, and Memorandum in support under seal, MOTION for Protective Order, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Response due by 10/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Proposed Redacted Document
                                                          **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Redaction of [1] Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Complaint
                                                                **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065499), filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Answer due by 11/28/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?