MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00731-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Joseph Livingstone +1 216 241 2838 +1 216 241 3707 flivingstone@taftlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James William Poirier +1 202 616 0856 +1 202 514 7969 james.poirier@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/26/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $1731000
Nature of Suit 128 - Contract - Subsidy
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 2/4/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated February 4, 2008, forwarded to Fred Joseph Livingstone. See letter in file. (bre, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $50,068.00, inclusive of interest. No costs. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER. Pursuant to the Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by the parties on February 1, 2008, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against the United States in the amount of $50,068.00, inclusive of interest. No costs. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
        LREF
        Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008
        STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment, filed by all parties. (Livingstone, Fred)
          LREF
          Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 2/8/2008. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
            LREF
            Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
            STATUS REPORT, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP. (Livingstone, Fred)
              LREF
              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 1/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
              MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/08/2008 to JPSR, filed by USA.Response due by 2/11/2008.(Poirier, James)
                LREF
                Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 1/25/2008. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008, Terminated: 1/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/25/2008 to JPSR, filed by USA.(Poirier, James)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [25] motion for enlargement of time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 1/18/2008. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/18/2008 to JPSR in light of settlement activities, filed by USA.(Poirier, James)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 1/4/2008. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JPSR, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP, USA.Response due by 12/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Livingstone, Fred)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 12/10/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/10/2007 to JPSR, filed by USA.Response due by 12/13/2007.(Poirier, James)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 11/23/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 11/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/23/2007 to File JPSR, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP, USA.Response due by 12/3/2007.(Livingstone, Fred)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [16] Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 11/16/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007, Terminated: 2/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/16/2007 to Joint Preliminary Status Report, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP.Response due by 10/9/2007.(Livingstone, Fred)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007, Terminated: 9/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/16/2007 to JPSR out of time, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP, USA.Response due by 10/9/2007.(Poirier, James)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 9/17/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007, Terminated: 8/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/17/2007 to File Joint Preliminary Status Report, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP.Response due by 8/20/2007.(Livingstone, Fred)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting [12] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. The Clerk is directed to file the governments answer today. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007, Terminated: 6/15/2007 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attached answer Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 7/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix answer)(Poirier, James)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [9] Motion to Stay; denying [10] Motion to Stay. Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 5/17/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings until July 27, 2007, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP, USA.Response due by 6/1/2007.(Poirier, James)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007, Terminated: 5/17/2007 ADR Motion to Stay
                                                      First JOINT MOTION for a Stay of Proceedings pending further discussion with the ADR judge not ADR related, filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP, USA.(Poirier, James)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 2/26/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006, Terminated: 12/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/26/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint filed by USA.(Poirier, James)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James William Poirier for USA. (Poirier, James)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP. Service: 10/26/06.(dw1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                    NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [04-805C and 04-806C] filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP. Service: 10/26/06.(dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (HUD) (Filing fee $250 and Receipt number 065619) filed by MAYFLOWER HOUSING PARTNERSHIP. Answer due by 12/26/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dw1)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?