ROBINSON v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00737-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MICHELLE ROBINSON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by altlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Philip Edwards +1 404 526 8866 +1 404 526 8855 dedwards@altlaw.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/27/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Description not available
SCHEDULING ORDER: By 11/13/2008, respondent shall send petitioner the joint stipulation for petitioner's signatures. Additionally, respondent shall file a status report advising the court of the date the stipulation was forwarded to petitioner. Petitioner shall, within thirty (30) days after receipt of the stipulation, either return the stipulation to respondent and file a status report notifying the court of the same, or file a status report detailing the status of the settlement. Respondent shall file the signed stipulation within fifteen (15) days after its receipt from petitioner. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
    Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 7/31/2008 held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: Status Conference held on 7/31/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Conference Order
      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/31/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
        Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 7/21/2008 held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: Status Conference held on 7/21/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Status Conference Order
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 7/02/08. The parties are continuing to negotiate damages. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/21/2008 12:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for 6/26/08, is hereby RESCHEDULED for 7/2/2008 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Status Conference Order
              ORDER: A telephonic status conference was held on 6/4/08. The parties are continuing to negotiate a settlement. The next Status Conference is set for 6/26/2008 11:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008
                Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 6/4/2008 held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: Status Conference held on 6/4/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Description not available
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/4/2008 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008
                    Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 5/1/2008 held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Status Conference held on 5/1/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. The parties are continuing to negotiate a settlement. The next status conference shall be held on Wednesday, June 4, 2008, at 10:30 a.m. (EDT). (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Description not available
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/1/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Description not available
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The undersigned hereby GRANTS respondent's counsel's request to file life care plan.Status Conference set for 4/18/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Petitioner's counsel shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 5/1/08. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Status Conference Order
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A status conference was held on 3/13/08. The parties are continuing to engage in settlement negotiations regarding the damages portion of the case. The parties will meet with their life care planners in a joint meeting to discuss the issues remaining. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/18/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : A telephonic status conference was held on March 13, 2008. The proceeding was not officialy recorded. The parties are continuing to engage in settlement negotiations regarding the damages portion of this case. The parties will meet with their life care planners in a joint meeting to discuss the issues remaining.The next telephonic status conference shall be held on Friday, April 18, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. (EDT).
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/8/2008 Medical Records
                              MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #3] filed by MICHELLE ROBINSON. Service: 2/22/08.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Description not available
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/14/2008 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on February 8, 2008. The parties are continuing to engage in settlement negotiations regarding the damages portion of this case.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Status Conference Order
                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: At petitioner's request the status conference previously scheduled for 2/08/08 at 10:30 am shall be rescheduled for 2/8/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: At the Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/07/08, the parties informed the undersigned that the Life Care Planners had a productive meeting in December and only a couple of items remain at issue. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/8/2008 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : A telephonic status conference was held on January 7, 2008. The parties informed the undersigned that the life care planners had a productive meeting in December and only a couple of items remain at issue.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Description not available
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/7/2008 11:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on November 15, 2007. The parties informed the court that they are engaging in settlement negotiations.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Status Conference Order
                                              ORDER: Respondent has sent this case to a Life Care Planner and will determine whether to engage in settlement negotiations, and if so, will send petitioner a counter-offer, Respondent's Rule 4(c) Report is hereby SUSPENDED pending respondent's determination of whether to engage in settlement negoiations. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/15/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on October 11, 2007.Petitioner's counsel sent respondent an updated life care plan and made a demand on respondent in September. Respondent has sent the case to a life care planner and will determine whether to engage in settlement negotiations, and if so, will send petitioner a counter-offer.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/11/2007 02:30 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                                                    NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Edwards, Donald)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                                      ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 ERRATA
                                                        ERRATA correcting [17] Scheduling Order. The next telephonic status conference is set for 8/21/07 at 10:30 a.m. (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/21/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/22/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                              LIFE CARE PLAN assessed by Michelle Robinson filed by MICHELLE ROBINSON.Life Care Plan due 8/29/2007. Service: 7/10/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on 7/11/07. By the next status conference respondent's counsel shall evaluate petitioner's life care plan and determine how respondent would like to proceed. Petitioner shall (1) file petitioner's insurance policy information and (2) contact Ms. Butler to make certain that the costs included in the life care plan are costs that petitioner's insurance would not pay for.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Description not available
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference previously scheduled for 6/4/07, shall be rescheduled for 7/11/2007 at 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Petitioner shall file a written report by 7/2/07. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Respondent will make make an offer on petitioner by 5/07/07. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/4/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on 4/20/07. The parties discussed the categories of damages for which petitioner may be compensated. Respondent shall make an offer on petitioner by 5/7/07. The next telephonic status conference shall be held on 6/4/07 at 10:30 a.m.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/18/2007 Damages Order
                                                                        DAMAGES ORDER Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/18/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Respondent has informed the court that the parties will engage in litigative risk settlement negotiations. Petitioner shall make a demand on respondent by 4/10/07. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/20/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on 3/14/07. The parties will engage in litigative risk settlement negotiations. Petitioner shall make a demand on respondent by 4/10/07. The next telephonic status conference shall be held on 4/20/07 at 11:00 a.m.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference reset for 3/14/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/7/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. The respondent report and expert report deadline are postponed. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on 2/28/07 at 11:00 a.m. Respondent's Rule 4(c) Report and expert report deadline is postponed until respondent determines whether he will engage in litigative risk settlement.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Medical Records
                                                                                    MEDICAL RECORD SUPPLEMENT to FILE REPORT from Albert Humphrey, M.D filed by Petitioner. Service: 2/26/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/15/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                                      ORDER: Petitioner shall file an expert report and accompanying CV from Dr. Humphreys. If possible, respondent shall file a Rule 4(c) Report, along with an expert report and accompanying CV. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/28/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 1/9/07. The parties discussed Dr. Cook's supplemental report. Petitioner will be filing a report from Dr. Humphreys. If possible, respondent will be filing a Rule 4(c) Report and an Expert Report and accompanying CV by the next status conference.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 1/2/2007 Expert Report
                                                                                          EXPERT REPORT of Albert A. Cook, M.D. (Ex. no. 1) filed by MICHELLE ROBINSON. Service: 12/22/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 1/9/2007 Description not available
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a supplemental report from Dr. Cook due by 12/15/06. The undersigned GRANTS respondent the authority to SUBPOENA any and all medical records. Status Conference set for 1/9/2007 11:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephonic Status Conference held on November 21, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Status Conference set for 11/21/2006 03:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Milmoe for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/03/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Petition
                                                                                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065626) [Filed with one volume], filed by MICHELLE ROBINSON.Respondents Report due by 1/25/2007.(tjk, )
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?