LYF FOUNDATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00739-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LYF FOUNDATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc K. Sellers +1 503 796 2917 +1 503 796 2900 msellers@schwabe.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/30/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 10/15/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Court Filing
ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Rapp, William)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Terminated Case - Public
      Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER granting [15] Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/6/2007 Motion to Stay
          Joint MOTION to Stay all proceedings, filed by LYF FOUNDATION, USA.Response due by 9/21/2007.(Rapp, William)
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due 9/10/07; Cross-Motions for Judgment on the Administrative Record due 10/10/07; Responses due 11/13/07. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007
              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Rapp, William)
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 8/3/2007. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007, Terminated: 6/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 3, 2007 to file JPSR, filed by LYF FOUNDATION, USA.Response due by 6/21/2007.(Rapp, William)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 6/4/2007. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until June 4, 2007 to file JPSR, filed by LYF FOUNDATION, USA.Response due by 5/7/2007.(Rapp, William)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007
                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 4/20/2007.(Rapp, William)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                          ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 2/27/2007.(signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/27/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 1/2/2007.(Rapp, William)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                              NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Rapp for USA. (Rapp, William)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER: Although designated as an electronic case in the court's case management/electronic case filing (CM/ECF) system, any filing in excess of 100 pages (inclusive of appendices/exhibits) will be filed in traditional, hard-copy form, and not in electronic form. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065631), filed by LYF FOUNDATION.Answer due by 12/29/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dls )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?