BLAKLEY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00749-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Gerald Nath +1 703 761 5014
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/3/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $1000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 7/13/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5164'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008
REPLY to [19] Response to [18] MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental declaration for fees, # (2) Exhibit to declaration for fees)(Nath, Robert) Modified on 9/14/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
    LREF
    Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's reply in support of motion for attorney fees due by 9/4/2008. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw) Modified on 8/8/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
      LREF
      Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Court Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER: In Chambers Conference set for 8/4/2008 01:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
        Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington DC (telephonic) on 8/4/2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden: Scheduling Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jw)
          LREF
          Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 CAFC Mandate Affirming
          MANDATE of CAFC affirming [12] Unpublished Opinion/Order directing the Clerk to enter judgment. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/4/2008 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Robert Gerald Nath, also certified copy of judgment forwarded to the Tax Division of the Department of Justice. See letter in file. (bre,)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Terminated:
                  CAFC Case Number 07-5164 for [20] Notice of Appeal filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER staying [18] Motion for Attorney Fees pending resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jw)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Notice of Appeal
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 067090. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                        RESPONSE to [18] MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by USA.Reply due by 9/27/2007. (Christensen, Jacob) Modified on 9/11/2007 to correct reply due date. (Samler, Debbie).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007
                          MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY.Response due by 9/10/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh A-EAJA form# (2) Exhibit Exh B-time entries)(Nath, Robert)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER denying [13] Motion to Vacate; denying [15] Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                            RESPONSE to [15] MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/6/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Relief from Judgment - Rule 60
                              MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60, filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Nath, Robert)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $200.00, plus statutory interest. (lld)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion to Vacate
                                  MOTION to Vacate FINAL ORDER, TO RESTORE CASE TO DOCKET, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO CLARIFY FINAL ORDER, filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY.Response due by 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Nath, Robert)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Court Filing
                                    UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [11] Motion. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $200, plus interest. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION for Entry of Judgment, filed by USA.Response due by 7/27/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion to Stay
                                        MOTION to Stay proceedings, filed by USA.Response due by 7/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Reports will be disclosed by 8/31/2007. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2007. The parties will file a Joint Status Report by 12/31/2007 regarding further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 4/23/2007.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/2/2007.(signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006, Terminated: 12/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/2/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065649), filed by BRIAN ALAN BLAKLEY.Answer due by 1/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dls )
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 229 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?