MARTINEZ v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00797-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRENDA J. MARTINEZ, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Michael Schwind +1 202 353 2345 +1 202 353 7661 gregg,schwind@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/28/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 6/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [13] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record, Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive], Published Opinion/Order, Order on Cross Motion [Dispositive], and directing the Clerk to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by BRENDA J. MARTINEZ. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 066894. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of the Government. (lld)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Court Filing
        PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND FINAL ORDER granting the Government's March 19, 2007 [8] Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record;and denying plaintiff's May 21, 2007 [11] Cross Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for the Government. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (lld)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Response to Cross Motion [Dispositive]
          RESPONSE to [11] CROSS MOTION and reply to RESPONSE to [8] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Reply due by 7/6/2007. Service: 6/19/07.(dls)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007, Terminated: 6/29/2007 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
            CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [8] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA, filed by BRENDA J. MARTINEZ [by leave of the judge]. Copy to defendant. Response due by 6/18/2007.(dls)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Administrative Record
              Notice of Filing and ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, contained in one volume, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 3/13/07.(dls)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Statement of Facts
                STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [8] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 3/13/07.(dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 3/13/07.Response due by 4/13/2007.(dls)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 ExhibitCourt Filing
                    Exhibit List, filed by BRENDA J. MARTINEZ. Filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 3/8/2007.(hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007
                      ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/15/2007.(signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/15/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 1/23/07.(dls)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                          ADDENDUM to [1] Complaint by BRENDA J. MARTINEZ filed [by leave of the judge]. Copies to defendant. (dls )
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg M. Schwind for USA. Service: 12/12/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065747), filed by BRENDA J. MARTINEZ.Answer due by 1/29/2007.(dls )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?