GERBER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00807-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A. RUSSELL GERBER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando A. Rodriguez-Feo +1 202 307 3390 armando.rodriguez-feo@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/1/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County None
Terminated 8/1/2007
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Eugene R. Fidell. See letter in file. (bre, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $106,564.72, inclusive of all back pay, attorney fees and costs. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Court Filing
      UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (CLB)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Stipulation for Entry of Judgment), filed by A. RUSSELL GERBER. (Fidell, Eugene)
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [12] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to July 31 to file Answer,Answer due by 7/31/2007. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (SWF)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/31/2007 to File Answer re [6] Second Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 7/23/2007.(Rodriguez-Feo, Armando)
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to July 6. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (SWF)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/6/2007 to Answer or other responsive pleading, filed by USA.Response due by 6/12/2007.(Rodriguez-Feo, Armando)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [8] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to June 6 to file Answer,Answer due by 6/6/2007. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (SWF)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/6/2007 to File Answer re [6] Second Amended Complaint UNOPPOSED, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Rodriguez-Feo, Armando)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Armando A. Rodriguez-Feo for USA. (Rodriguez-Feo, Armando)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Amended Complaint
                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by A. RUSSELL GERBER.(mij, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2007 (mij, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER Striking [4] Amended Complaint. Plaintiff will refile Amended Complaint by March 13, 2007. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
                            **STRUCK**AMENDED COMPLAINT (PHS Pay and Allowances; Breach of Settlement Agreement), filed by A. RUSSELL GERBER.. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal)(Fidell, Eugene) Modified on 3/6/2007 (mij, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mij, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mij, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                                  Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia (Washington, DC); Case Number 03-248. Original file with documents numbered 1-35, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by A. RUSSELL GERBER.Transfer Complaint due by 12/29/2006. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(mij, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?