JAEGERS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-vv-00819-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGELA JAEGERS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Nurenberg, Plevin, Heller & McCarthy Co., LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mester +1 216 621 2300 +1 216 771 2242 tmester@nphm.com
No Logo BRITTANY CORDES, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Nurenberg, Plevin, Heller & McCarthy Co., LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mester +1 216 621 2300 +1 216 771 2242 tmester@nphm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Ann Watts +1 202 616 4099 lisa.a.watts@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/1/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
ORDER re [36] Response filed by ANGELA JAEGERS. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008
    NOTICE, filed by ANGELA JAEGERS Deposition of Brittany Cordes. (Mester, Thomas)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008
      NOTICE, filed by ANGELA JAEGERS Deposition of Angela Jaegers. (Mester, Thomas)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
        RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause, filed by ANGELA JAEGERS. (Mester, Thomas)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
          NOTICE, filed by ANGELA JAEGERS Depo of Susan McLaughlin. (Mester, Thomas)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Petitioner is ordered to show cause. Response is due from petitioner by 9/12/2008. Petitioner shall also file a status report by 9/12/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
              STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report regarding deposition of fact witness due by 4/18/2008 Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                STATUS REPORT ORDERStatus Report from petitioner due by 2/29/2008 regarding arranging deposition. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Hearing set for 10/16/2008 09:30 AM in Out of Town Location before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Hearing set for 10/16/2008 09:30 AM in Out of Town Location before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 1/22/2008 at 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Status Report due by 2/11/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference held on 1/8/08 to set hearing date. (szs)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                          NOTICE OF FILING Medical Literature by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C# (2) Exhibit D# (3) Exhibit E# (4) Exhibit F)(Watts, Lisa)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Medical literature due by 11/30/2007. Status Conference set for 12/14/2007 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference held on 11/6/07. (szs)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/6/2007 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007
                                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                    Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit MacDonald MD Expert Report# (2) Exhibit MacDonald MD CV)(Watts, Lisa)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                      ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Report due by 10/19/2007.,Respondents Report due by 10/19/2007. Status conference scheduled for 9/20/07 cancelled. Status conference rescheduled for 11/1/07 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/1/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007, Terminated: 9/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Rule 4 Report and Expert Opinion, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 9/24/2007. (Watts, Lisa)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                            Exhibit List CV of Daniel Adler, M.D., filed by BRITTANY CORDES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Adler, M.D. CV Exhibit 14)(Mester, Thomas)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondents Report due by 9/10/2007. Status Conference set for 9/20/2007 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference held on 07/25/07 to discuss completeness of medical records and to schedule the filing of respondent's report. (Moran, Christian)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                                                  Compact Disc Received by the Clerk's Office re [19] Notice of Filing on Compact Disc. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #12 filed by BRITTANY CORDES.Compact Disc due by 7/26/2007. (Mester, Thomas)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #13] filed by ANGELA JAEGERS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Report of Daniel Adler, M.D.)(Mester, Thomas)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2007 (tjk, ).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Electronically is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file the Medical Records from Metro Health as soon as possible. Respondent's deadline for filing the Status Report has been moved and is now due by 7/23/2007. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/25/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            MOTION Motion to convert case to electronic filing, filed by ANGELA JAEGERS, BRITTANY CORDES. Service: 6/12/07.Response due by 6/29/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Description not available
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a status report on the completeness of the medical records by 7/6/07. Status Conference set for 7/16/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 6/4/07. (szs)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by ANGELA JAEGERS, BRITTANY CORDES. Service: 5/4/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT (Susan McLaughlin) by ANGELA JAEGERS, BRITTANY CORDES. Service: 5/10/07.(tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Order
                                                                      ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA. Ms. Jaeger's counsel is hereby authorized to sign and to serve a subpoena on Metro Health Medical Center. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Description not available
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/4/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 4/30/07 to discuss progress on collecting medical records. (szs)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 notice of filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits #1-10 by ANGELA JAEGERS, BRITTANY CORDES. Service: 4/20/07. File by leave of the Special Master.(Neal, Alonzo) Modified on 4/30/2007 (Neal, Alonzo).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Description not available
                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Copy should be filed by 5/9/07. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Description not available
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall tab, number, and refile all records previously filed with the court. Petitioner shall ensure to serve a copy on respondent. Also by 4/23/07, petitioner shall file affidavits, both her own and from the hospital, regarding the vaccination. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/30/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 3/23/07 to set date for filing medical records. (szs)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/25/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/23/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Initial Order
                                                                                      INITIAL ORDER The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 1/05/07, to schedule the initial status conference. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Watts for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/18/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/10/2006 Order
                                                                                          ORDER regarding filing requirements. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
                                                                                            Remark : Clerk's note. Petitioner filed one copy of records with the court. Petitioner's counsel not a member of the bar of the CFC upon filing, application for admission to the bar is pending. (tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Petition
                                                                                                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065773) [Vaccination date: 12/2003], filed by ANGELA JAEGERS, BRITTANY CORDES.Respondents Report due by 3/1/2007.(tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?