BANERJEE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00829-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo URMILA BANERJEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Reed +1 302 477 2070 +1 302 477 2257 tjreed@mail.widener.edu
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meredyth Dawn Cohen +1 202 353 7978 +1 202 514 7965 meredyth.cohen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/6/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $117000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/27/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed and judgment is in favor of defendant. (lld)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Court Filing
    Opinion: Granting [11] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and Granting [11] Motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record; denying [12] Motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record. This Opinion will be PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of the Defendant dismissing the complaint. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [12] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and reply to Summary Judgment filed by the United States, [11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , in part, and for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , in part, and for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, filed by USA. (Cohen, Meredyth)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
        MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and reply to Summary Judgment filed by the United States, filed by URMILA BANERJEE.Response due by 6/11/2007.(Reed, Thomas)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , in part, and for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record, filed by USA.Response due by 5/11/2007 (per court order). (Cohen, Meredyth) Modified on 5/2/2007 to edit due date for response. (Samler, Debbie).
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
            RESPONSE to [8] Scheduling Order Joint Statement of Facts, filed by USA. (Cohen, Meredyth)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
              ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Cover letter and index# (2) Tab 1# (3) Tab 2# (4) Tab 3 Part 1# (5) Tab 3 Part 2# (6) Tab 3 Part 3# (7) Tab 3 Part 4# (8) Tab 3 Part 5# (9) Tab 3 Part 6# (10) Tab 3 Part 7# (11) Tab 3 Part 8# (12) Tab 3 Part 9# (13) Tab 3 Part 10# (14) Tab 3 Part 11# (15) Tab 3 Part 12# (16) Tab 3 Part 13# (17) Tab 3 Part 14# (18) Tab 4# (19) Tab 5# (20) Tab 6 Part 1# (21) Tab 6 Part 2# (22) Tab 6 Part 3# (23) Tab 6 Part 4# (24) Tab 7 Part 1# (25) Tab 7 Part 2)(Cohen, Meredyth)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 3/14/2007. Defendant Brief due by 4/27/2007. Response due by 5/11/2007. Reply due by 5/18/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (ah1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (ah1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007, Terminated: 2/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/6/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Cohen, Meredyth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Court Filing
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 2/21/2007 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (vh1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Meredyth Dawn Cohen for USA. (Cohen, Meredyth)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Filing Fee Received
                        Additional Filing fee received re:[1] Complaint. ( $100, receipt number 065854). (dls )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 065795), filed by URMILA BANERJEE.Answer due by 2/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits to Complaint; # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(dls )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 175 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?